EP0879027 - AXIALLY FLEXIBLE STENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK, MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAY, Larry, B. 15 Iris Drive Merrimack, NH 03054 / US | 02 /
ECKERT, Ann 2902 Hermitage Avenue Easton, PA 18045 / US | 03 /
CHELAK, Todd 199 C4 N. Beverwyck Road Lake Hiawatha, NJ 07034 / US | 04 /
TUMARKIN, Robert 17 Augusta Avenue Edison, NJ 08820 / US | [1998/48] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | Fisher, Adrian John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97903824.7 | 23.01.1997 | [1998/48] | WO1997US00672 | Priority number, date | US19960010686P | 26.01.1996 Original published format: US 10686 P | US19960017479P | 26.04.1996 Original published format: US 17479 P | US19960017415P | 08.05.1996 Original published format: US 17415 P | US19960024110P | 16.08.1996 Original published format: US 24110 P | [1998/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9726840 | Date: | 31.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0879027 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0879027 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [1998/48] | CPC: |
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61F2/915 (EP,US);
A61F2/885 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91525 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91541 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91558 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/48] | Title | German: | LÄNGSFLEXIBLER STENT | [1998/48] | English: | AXIALLY FLEXIBLE STENT | [1998/48] | French: | PROTHESE ENDOVASCULAIRE A FLEXIBILITE AXIALE | [1998/48] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 09.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 17.12.2003 | MC | 31.01.2004 | DK | 17.03.2004 | GR | 17.03.2004 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/33] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 17.12.2003 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US5449373 (PINCHASIK GREGORY [IL], et al) [AD] 1* column A; figure - *; | [PX]EP0734698 (VARIOMED AG [LI]) [PX] 1-3,13 * column 8, line 21 - column 9, line 10; figures 6-8 * |