EP0817814 - CARBON BLACKS AND COMPOSITIONS INCORPORATING THE CARBON BLACKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION Two Seaport Lane Suite 1300 Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION Two Seaport Lane, Suite 1300 Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US | ||
Former [1998/03] | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION 75 State Street Boston, MA 02109-1806 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANT, Ravindra Apartment E7, 2600 North Hobart Street Pampa, TX 79065 / US | [1998/03] | Representative(s) | Crisp, David Norman, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Crisp, David Norman, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97903827.0 | 22.01.1997 | [1998/03] | WO1997US00682 | Priority number, date | US19960595037 | 31.01.1996 Original published format: US 595037 | [1998/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9728222 | Date: | 07.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0817814 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0817814 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/50, C08K3/04 | [1998/03] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, LI, LU, PT, SE [1998/03] | Extension states | LT | 06.10.1997 | Title | German: | RUSSE UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1998/03] | English: | CARBON BLACKS AND COMPOSITIONS INCORPORATING THE CARBON BLACKS | [1998/03] | French: | NOIRS DE CARBONE ET COMPOSITIONS CONTENANT LES NOIRS DE CARBONE | [1998/03] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/03] | 17.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01103196.0 / EP1114848 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Request for further processing for: | 05.01.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 05.01.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 22.01.2003 | [2004/39] | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH04252286 ; | [A]EP0159469 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [A] 1-62 * claim 8 *; | [A]US4684687 (BREACH WILLIAM D [US], et al) [A] 1-62 * column 6, line 47 - line 58 *; | [A]EP0334992 (HITACHI CABLE [JP]) [A] 1-62 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0384080 (COLUMBIAN CHEM [US]) [A] 1-62 * page 6, lines 51-54 * * page 9, lines 1-35 *; | [A]FR2652586 (TOKAI CARBON KK [JP]) [A] 1-62 * page 3, lines 7-8 * * page 4, lines 29-33; table 2 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 42, Database accession no. 92-346281, XP002032642 & JPH04252286 A 19920908 (TOYODA GOSEI) [A] 1-62 * abstract * | [A] - "Standard Test Method for Carbon Black-Iodine Adsorption Number", ANNUAL BOOK OF ASTM STANDARDS, PHILADELPHIA, USA, (1991), vol. 09.01, pages 270 - 275, XP002032641 [A] * page 270 * |