EP0822786 - IMAGE SOUND AND FEELING SIMULATION SYSTEM FOR DENTISTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Denx Ltd. 106 Moshav Ora 90880 Jerusalem / IL | [1998/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYKA, Alon 106 Moshav Ora 90880 Jerusalem / IL | 02 /
EYTAN, Liat 106 Moshav Ora 90880 Jerusalem / IL | [1998/07] | Representative(s) | Lee, Nicholas John Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | Lee, Nicholas John Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97903973.2 | 29.01.1997 | [1998/07] | WO1997US01214 | Priority number, date | US19960593300 | 29.01.1996 Original published format: US 593300 | [1998/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9726838 | Date: | 31.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0822786 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.07.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61C3/00, G09B23/28, A61C13/00 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
G09B23/283 (EP,US);
A61C1/082 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/07] | A61C3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB [1998/07] | Title | German: | GEFÜHLS- UND GERÄUSCHDARSTELLUNGSSYSTEM FÜR ZAHNHEILKUNDE | [1998/07] | English: | IMAGE SOUND AND FEELING SIMULATION SYSTEM FOR DENTISTRY | [1998/07] | French: | SYSTEME DE SIMULATION D'IMAGE, DE SON ET DE SENSATION POUR LA DENTISTERIE | [1998/07] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.1997 | Search fee paid | 21.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/07] | 07.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/48] | 22.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9115163 (MUSHABAC DAVID R [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,12-14 * page 16, paragraph L - page 28, paragraph 3; figures 1-16; claims 1,2,5,8,11,25,27,30-36,57,58,65,93 *; | [A]US5092022 (DURET FRANCOIS [FR]) [A] 1,2,12 * column 11, line 28 - column 11, line 42; figure 30 * | International search | [X]US4478580 (BARRUT LUC P [FR]); | [X]US5017139 (MUSHABAC DAVID R [US]); | [X]US5163842 (NONOMURA YUUSUKE [JP]) | by applicant | US4858001 | US5049070 | US5178536 | US5052924 | US19950579106 |