EP0880553 - INCREASING THE MOLECULAR WEIGHT OF POLYCONDENSATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.06.2001 [2001/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [1998/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFAENDNER, Rudolf Sackgasse 3 D-64668 Rimbach / DE | 02 /
HOFFMANN, Kurt Hans-Willmann-Strasse 1a D-67157 Wachenheim / DE | 03 /
HERBST, Heinz Kreuzberger Strasse 16 64646 Heppenheim / DE | [1998/49] | Application number, filing date | 97904376.7 | 04.02.1997 | [1998/49] | WO1997EP00492 | Priority number, date | CH19960000393 | 15.02.1996 Original published format: CH 39396 | [1998/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9730105 | Date: | 21.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0880553 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0880553 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08G69/48, C08G73/06, C08G63/91, C08G64/42, C08G85/00, C08G59/40, C08L63/00, C08G59/42 | [1998/49] | CPC: |
C08L63/00 (EP,US);
C08G59/4014 (EP,US);
C08G59/4276 (EP,US);
C08G63/916 (EP,US);
C08G64/42 (EP,US);
C08G69/48 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L63/00, C08L2666/18 (US,EP);
C08L63/00, C08L77/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/49] | Title | German: | VERGRÖSSERUNG DES MOLEKULARGEWICHTS VON POLYKONDENSATEN | [2000/28] | English: | INCREASING THE MOLECULAR WEIGHT OF POLYCONDENSATES | [1998/49] | French: | AUGMENTATION DU POIDS MOLECULAIRE DE POLYCONDENSATS | [1998/49] |
Former [1998/49] | VERGRÖSSEREUNG DES MOLEKULARGEWICHTS VON POLYCONDENSATEN | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 15.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0386358 (SOMAR CORP [JP]); | [A]US5403896 (KHANNA YASH P [US], et al); | [A]WO9535343 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al); | [A]WO9324566 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]); | [A]JPS646019 ; | [DA]EP0604367 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]EP0628588 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [PAD]US5496920 (PFAENDNER RUDOLF [DE], et al) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 07, Database accession no. 89-050153, XP002034690 & JPS646019 A 19890110 (TORAY IND INC) [A] * abstract * |