EP0820439 - METHOD FOR THE ASYMMETRICAL SYNTHESIS OF S-ACYLATED DERIVATIVES OF 2-MERCAPTOMETHYL 3-PHENYL PROPANOIC ACID, AND USE THEREOF FOR SYNTHESISING N-(MERCAPTOACYL) AMINO ACID DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE CIVILE BIOPROJET 30, rue des Francs Bourgeois F-75003 Paris / FR | [1998/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANVY, Denis 2, rue Haimers F-76190 Yvetot / FR | 02 /
MONTEIL, Thierry 2, allée de Barsinghausen F-76130 Mont-Saint-Aignan / FR | 03 /
DUHAMEL, Pierre 32, rue J.-Boutrolle F-76130 Mont-Saint-Aignan / FR | 04 /
DUHAMEL, Lucette 32, rue J.-Boutrolle F-76130 Mont-Saint-Aignan / FR | 05 /
LECOMTE, Jeanne-Marie 30, rue des Francs-Bourgeois F-75003 Paris / FR | 06 /
SCHWARTZ, Jean-Charles 9, villa Seurat F-75014 Paris / FR | 07 /
NOEL-LEFEBRVRE, Nadine 6, rue du Pont-Chennevières 78760 Jouars Pontchartrin / FR | 08 /
GROS, Claude 31, rue Robert de Flers 75015 Paris / FR | 09 /
PLAQUEVENT, Jean-Christophe 8, côte du Mont aux Malades 76250 Deville-Les-Rouens / FR | [1998/05] | Representative(s) | Bernasconi, Jean Raymond, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Bernasconi, Jean Raymond, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1998/05] | Bernasconi, Jean, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97904485.6 | 04.02.1997 | [1998/05] | WO1997FR00218 | Priority number, date | FR19960001360 | 05.02.1996 Original published format: FR 9601360 | [1998/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9729086 | Date: | 14.08.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0820439 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0820439 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07C327/32, C07B53/00, // C07C33/26, C07C69/16, C07C59/48 | [1998/05] | CPC: |
C07C29/149 (EP,US);
C07C327/32 (EP,US);
C07C59/48 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/149, C07C33/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ASYMMETRISCHEN SYNTHESE VON S-ACYLIERTEN DERIVATEN VON 2-MERCAPTOMETHYL-3-PHENYLPROPIONSÄURE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR SYNTHESE VON N-MERCAPTOACYL AMINOSÄURE-DERIVATEN | [1998/05] | English: | METHOD FOR THE ASYMMETRICAL SYNTHESIS OF S-ACYLATED DERIVATIVES OF 2-MERCAPTOMETHYL 3-PHENYL PROPANOIC ACID, AND USE THEREOF FOR SYNTHESISING N-(MERCAPTOACYL) AMINO ACID DERIVATIVES | [1998/05] | French: | PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE ASYMETRIQUE DES DERIVES S-ACYLES DE L'ACIDE 2-MERCAPTOMETHYL 3-PHENYL PROPANOIQUE, APPLICATION A LA SYNTHESE DE DERIVES N-(MERCAPTOACYL) AMINO-ACIDES | [1998/05] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/05] | 27.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0136883 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [A] 17,21* voir exemples 1a, 2b, 5b, 6b, 8b, 11b, 12b *; | [YD]FR2623498 (BIOPROJET SOC CIV [FR]) [YD] 17-26 * example - *; | [D]EP0318377 (BIOPROJET SOC CIV [FR]); | [A]EP0377139 (BANYU PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,6-8,10,11 * examples 45,47 *; | [YD]EP0501870 (BIOPROJET SOC CIV [FR]) [YD] 17-26 * voir pages 4-5, schéma réactionnel (I) et synthèse (II) *; | [Y] - K. MORI ET AL, LIEBIGS ANN. CHEM., (1989), no. 10, pages 957 - 962, XP000611532 [Y] 1-4,6-8,10-15 * voir page 958, schéma 3; page 959, tableau 2; page 960 préparations des composés 13, 4, 5; page 961, préparation du composé 14 * | [YD] - S. ATSUUMI ET AL, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1990), vol. 31, no. 11, pages 1601 - 1604, XP002020256 [YD] 1-4,6-8,10-15 * voir page 1602, schéma 1; page 1603, lignes 1-19 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(90)80027-J | [Y] - B. STRIJTVEEN ET AL, RECUEIL DE TRAVAUX CHIMIQUES DES PAYS-BAS, (1987), vol. 106, no. 10, pages 539 - 542, XP000196631 [Y] 1-4,6-8,10-15 * voir page 540, schéma 3, 7c - 6c; page 541, préparation du composé 6c * | [A] - G. CARON ET AL, TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (1993), vol. 4, no. 9, pages 1995 - 2000, XP000611535 [A] 1-5,7,10,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0957-4166(00)82248-X |