EP0937047 - 1-ARYLPHTHALAZINE ANTAGONISTS OF EXCITATORY AMINO ACID RECEPTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRANSGENOMIC, Inc. 12325 Emmet Street Omaha, NE 68164 / US | [2005/09] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states Bearsden Bio, Inc. 34 Mount Pleasant Drive Aston, Pennsylvania 19016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLINS, Mark, A. 9 Craig Lane Frazer, PA 19355 / US | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97904810.5 | 15.01.1997 | [1999/34] | WO1997US00841 | Priority number, date | US19960588549 | 18.01.1996 Original published format: US 588549 | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9726247 | Date: | 24.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0937047 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0937047 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D237/30, C07D491/04, A61K31/50 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
C07D491/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/502 (EP,US);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D237/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/34] | Title | German: | ARYLPHTALAZINE ANTAGONISTEN VONEXITATONISCHEN AMINO SAÜRE REZEPTOREN | [1999/34] | English: | 1-ARYLPHTHALAZINE ANTAGONISTS OF EXCITATORY AMINO ACID RECEPTORS | [1999/34] | French: | 1-ARYLPHTHALAZINE ANTAGONISTE DE RECEPTEURS D'ACIDES AMINES EXCITATEURS | [1999/34] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.08.1998 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 26.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 15.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31] | Request for further processing for: | 15.09.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.01.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2000 | 31.01.2002 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   13.07.2002 | 31.01.2003 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   08.07.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.08.2004 | BE | 11.08.2004 | CH | 11.08.2004 | FI | 11.08.2004 | IT | 11.08.2004 | LI | 11.08.2004 | NL | 11.08.2004 | DK | 11.11.2004 | GR | 11.11.2004 | SE | 11.11.2004 | ES | 22.11.2004 | PT | 11.01.2005 | LU | 15.01.2005 | IE | 17.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
LU | 15.01.2005 | ||
IE | 17.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/24] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
IE | 17.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 11.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0475527 (STERLING DRUG INC [US]) [A] 1,6 * page 56 - page 58; example 135; claim -; table G *; | [PX]WO9640646 (SYMPHONY PHARM INC [US]) [PX] 1-17* the whole document * |