EP0883449 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING A DEVICE FOR REMOVING FLAT ITEMS OF POST FROM A STACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2002 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Dematic AG Gleiwitzer Strasse 555 90475 Nürnberg / DE | [2001/41] |
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILLMANN, Hanno Am Guckenbühl 14 D-78465 Konstanz / DE | 02 /
LÜBBEN, Hauke Alemannenstrasse 12 D-78315 Radolfzell / DE | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/41] | Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf. Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97905027.5 | 14.02.1997 | [1998/51] | WO1997EP00706 | Priority number, date | DE1996107304 | 27.02.1996 Original published format: DE 19607304 | [1998/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9731726 | Date: | 04.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0883449 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0883449 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B07C1/02 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
B65H5/34 (EP,US);
B07C1/04 (EP,US);
B65H7/02 (EP,US);
B65H7/14 (EP,US);
B65H2220/01 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4452 (EP,US);
B65H2511/22 (EP,US);
B65H2513/10 (EP,US);
B65H2553/416 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1916 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/22, B65H2220/01 (EP,US);
B65H2513/10, B65H2220/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER ABZUGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FLACHE SENDUNGEN VON EINEM STAPEL | [1998/51] | English: | METHOD OF CONTROLLING A DEVICE FOR REMOVING FLAT ITEMS OF POST FROM A STACK | [1998/51] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UN DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'EXTRAIRE DES ENVOIS POSTAUX PLATS D'UNE PILE | [1998/51] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.06.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 03.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 28.11.2001 | BE | 28.02.2002 | [2003/48] |
Former [2003/01] | GB | 28.11.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0057810 (FRAMA AG [CH]) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract ** page 11, line 6 - page 13, line 12 *; | [Y]US4541624 (SASAGE TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 9 - line 63; figure 2 * * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 21; figure 6 *; | [DY]EP0167091 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [DY] 1,2,4 * the whole document * |