EP0894093 - SOLUBLE TACHYKININ ANTAGONISTS, THE PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centro Interuniversitario di Ricerca sui Petptidi Bioattivi-Universita Degli Studi di Napoli Federico II Corso Umberto I, 74 80138 Napoli / IT | [1999/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAVONE, Vincenzo Via Mezzocannone, 4 I-80138 Napoli / IT | 02 /
LOMBARDI, Angelina Via Mezzocannone, 4 I-80138 Napoli / IT | 03 /
PEDONE, Carlo Via Mezzocannone, 4 I-80138 Napoli / IT | 04 /
DE ROSA, Mario Via Mezzocannone, 4 I-80138 Napoli / IT | 05 /
ROSSI, Mosé Via Mezzocannone, 4 I-80138 Napoli / IT | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Bianchetti, Giuseppe Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Bianchetti, Giuseppe, Prof. Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Rossini, 8 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 97905089.5 | 26.02.1997 | [1999/05] | WO1997EP00917 | Priority number, date | IT1996MI00401 | 01.03.1996 Original published format: IT MI960401 | [1999/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9731941 | Date: | 04.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0894093 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0894093 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/50 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
C07K7/22 (EP,US);
C07K7/06 (KR);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07K7/56 (EP,US);
C07K9/006 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/05] | Title | German: | LÖSLICHE TACHYKININ-ANTAGONISTEN, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [1999/05] | English: | SOLUBLE TACHYKININ ANTAGONISTS, THE PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF | [1999/05] | French: | ANTAGONISTES SOLUBLES DE LA TACHYKININE, LEUR PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [1999/05] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 30.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.05.2002 | BE | 22.05.2002 | CH | 22.05.2002 | FI | 22.05.2002 | FR | 22.05.2002 | GR | 22.05.2002 | IT | 22.05.2002 | LI | 22.05.2002 | NL | 22.05.2002 | DK | 22.08.2002 | PT | 22.08.2002 | SE | 22.08.2002 | DE | 23.08.2002 | ES | 28.11.2002 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 22.05.2002 | |
BE | 22.05.2002 | ||
CH | 22.05.2002 | ||
FI | 22.05.2002 | ||
FR | 22.05.2002 | ||
GR | 22.05.2002 | ||
LI | 22.05.2002 | ||
NL | 22.05.2002 | ||
DK | 22.08.2002 | ||
PT | 22.08.2002 | ||
SE | 22.08.2002 | ||
DE | 23.08.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
Former [2004/40] | AT | 22.05.2002 | |
BE | 22.05.2002 | ||
CH | 22.05.2002 | ||
FI | 22.05.2002 | ||
GR | 22.05.2002 | ||
LI | 22.05.2002 | ||
NL | 22.05.2002 | ||
DK | 22.08.2002 | ||
PT | 22.08.2002 | ||
SE | 22.08.2002 | ||
DE | 23.08.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 22.05.2002 | |
BE | 22.05.2002 | ||
CH | 22.05.2002 | ||
GR | 22.05.2002 | ||
LI | 22.05.2002 | ||
NL | 22.05.2002 | ||
DK | 22.08.2002 | ||
PT | 22.08.2002 | ||
SE | 22.08.2002 | ||
DE | 23.08.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 22.05.2002 | |
BE | 22.05.2002 | ||
CH | 22.05.2002 | ||
GR | 22.05.2002 | ||
LI | 22.05.2002 | ||
NL | 22.05.2002 | ||
DK | 22.08.2002 | ||
PT | 22.08.2002 | ||
SE | 22.08.2002 | ||
DE | 23.08.2002 | ||
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 22.05.2002 | |
CH | 22.05.2002 | ||
GR | 22.05.2002 | ||
LI | 22.05.2002 | ||
NL | 22.05.2002 | ||
DK | 22.08.2002 | ||
PT | 22.08.2002 | ||
SE | 22.08.2002 | ||
DE | 23.08.2002 | ||
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 22.05.2002 | |
CH | 22.05.2002 | ||
GR | 22.05.2002 | ||
LI | 22.05.2002 | ||
NL | 22.05.2002 | ||
DK | 22.08.2002 | ||
PT | 22.08.2002 | ||
SE | 22.08.2002 | ||
DE | 23.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 22.05.2002 | |
CH | 22.05.2002 | ||
GR | 22.05.2002 | ||
LI | 22.05.2002 | ||
NL | 22.05.2002 | ||
PT | 22.08.2002 | ||
SE | 22.08.2002 | ||
DE | 23.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 22.05.2002 | |
CH | 22.05.2002 | ||
GR | 22.05.2002 | ||
LI | 22.05.2002 | ||
NL | 22.05.2002 | ||
PT | 22.08.2002 | ||
SE | 22.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | AT | 22.05.2002 | |
CH | 22.05.2002 | ||
GR | 22.05.2002 | ||
LI | 22.05.2002 | ||
NL | 22.05.2002 | ||
SE | 22.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 22.05.2002 | |
CH | 22.05.2002 | ||
LI | 22.05.2002 | ||
NL | 22.05.2002 | ||
SE | 22.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 22.05.2002 | |
NL | 22.05.2002 | ||
SE | 22.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 22.05.2002 | |
SE | 22.08.2002 | ||
Former [2002/46] | SE | 22.08.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9303059 (MENARINI FARMA IND [IT]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9321227 (MENARINI FARMA IND [IT], et al) [DA] 1-4* the whole document *; | [A] - A.T. MCKNIGHT ET AL., "Pharmacological specificity of novel, synthetic, cyclic peptides as antagonists at tachykinin receptors", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, BASINGSTOKE, UK, (1991), vol. 104, pages 355 - 360, XP002036785 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | [A] - G. HÖLZEMANN ET AL., "Cyclic hexapeptide NK-2 antagonists", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PEPTIDE AND PROTEIN RESEARCH, COPENHAGEN, DK, (1994), vol. 44, pages 105 - 111, XP000456585 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | [DA] - C.A. MAGGI ET AL., "MEN 10,627, a novel polycyclic peptide antagonist of tachykinin NK2 receptors", JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, BALTIMORE, MD,US, (1994), vol. 271, no. 3, pages 1489 - 1500, XP000575460 [DA] 1-4 * the whole document * | [AD] - V. PAVONE TE AL.,, "Design and structure of a novel Neurokinin A receptor antagonist cyclo(-Met1-Asp2-Trp3-Phe4-Dap5-Leu6-)cyclo(2beta-5beta)", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 2, LETCHWORTH, GB, (1995), pages 987 - 993, XP002036786 [AD] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/p29950000987 |