EP0885179 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING FLUORINATED AROMATICS AND FLUORINATED NITROGEN-CONTAINING HETERO-AROMATICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Research & Technologies GmbH & Co KG 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1999/48] |
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states Hoechst Research & Technology Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
APPEL, Wolfgang Taunusstrasse 74A D-65779 Kelkheim / DE | 02 /
PASENOK, Sergej Am Flachsland 56 D-65779 Kelkheim / DE | 03 /
KLEINER, Hans-Jerg Altkönigstrasse 11a D-61476 Kronberg / DE | [1998/52] | Representative(s) | Ackermann, Joachim Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Ackermann Postfach 11 13 26 60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Ackermann, Joachim, Dr. Postfach 11 13 26 60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 97905116.6 | 28.02.1997 | [1998/52] | WO1997EP00970 | Priority number, date | DE1996108791 | 07.03.1996 Original published format: DE 19608791 | [1998/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9732832 | Date: | 12.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0885179 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07B39/00, C07C17/20, C07C45/63, C07C201/12, C07D213/61, C07D239/30 | [1998/52] | CPC: |
C07D239/42 (EP,KR);
C07B39/00 (EP,KR);
C07C201/12 (EP,KR);
C07C45/63 (EP,KR);
C07D213/61 (EP,KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C201/12, C07C205/12 (EP);
C07C45/63, C07C47/55 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1998/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FLUORIERTEN AROMATEN UND FLUORIERTEN STICKSTOFFHALTIGEN HETEROAROMATEN | [1998/52] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING FLUORINATED AROMATICS AND FLUORINATED NITROGEN-CONTAINING HETERO-AROMATICS | [1998/52] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE COMPOSES AROMATIQUES FLUORES ET DE COMPOSES HETEROAROMATIQUES FLUORES RENFERMANT DE L'AZOTE | [1998/52] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/52] | 18.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2525442 (BAYER AG) [A] 1 * page 2 - page 5; claim - *; | [A]EP0523671 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]US5315043 (FERNANDEZ RICHARD E [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |