EP0838457 - NOVEL PYRIDINE DERIVATIVES AND MEDICINES CONTAINING THE SAME AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2001 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SS PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 12-4, Nihonbashihama-cho, 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states SS Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 12-4, Nihonbashihama-cho, 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASEGAWA, Hiroshi 17-19, Osakidai 3-chome Sakura-shi, Chiba 285 / JP | 02 /
MIKAMI, Tadashi 280-6, Mizuhodai 3-chome Sawara-shi, Chiba 287 / JP | 03 /
TACHIBANA, Koichi 1-21-407, Azuma 2-chome Narita-shi, Chiba 286 / JP | 04 /
YAMAZAKI, Kazuo 236-9, Mizuhodai 3-chome Sawara-shi, Chiba 287 / JP | 05 /
KAWAMOTO, Noriyuki 12-6-207, Karabe 5-chome Narita-shi, Chiba 286 / JP | 06 /
SHIOIRI, Noriaki 1-503, 1-1, Tamatsukuri 7-chome Narita-shi, Chiba 286 / JP | 07 /
KUSANO, Koji 1143, Nanpeidai Narita-shi, Chiba 286 / JP | 08 /
SATO, Susumu 15-5, Tamatsukuri 6-chome Narita-shi, Chiba 286 / JP | 09 /
MATSUDA, Hideaki 29-8, Higashiabiko 2-chome Abiko-shi, Chiba 270-11 / JP | 10 /
YOKOYAMA, Toshio 19-5-109, Machiya 7-chome Arakawa-ku, Tokyo 116 / JP | [1998/18] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97905460.8 | 07.03.1997 | [1998/18] | WO1997JP00712 | Priority number, date | JP19960058906 | 15.03.1996 Original published format: JP 5890696 | [1998/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9733870 | Date: | 18.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0838457 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.09.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/69, C07D405/06, C07D409/06, C07D401/06, A61K31/44, A61K31/445, A61K31/535, A61K31/55 | [1998/18] | CPC: |
C07D213/69 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/44 (KR);
C07D405/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07D409/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/18] | Title | German: | PYRIDIN-DERIVATE UND DIESE ALS AKTIVE BESTANDTEILE EINTHALTENDEMEDIKAMENTE. | [1998/18] | English: | NOVEL PYRIDINE DERIVATIVES AND MEDICINES CONTAINING THE SAME AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT | [1998/18] | French: | NOUVEAUX DERIVES DE PYRIDINE ET MEDICAMENTS CONTENANT CES DERIVES EN QUALITE D'INGREDIENT ACTIF | [1998/18] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.1997 | Translation filed | 07.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.1997 | Search fee paid | 07.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/18] | 01.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/11] | 15.09.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPH01290683 [ ] (BANYU PHARMA CO LTD); | [A]EP0462800 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [A] 1-10* example 30; claims 1,14 *; | [X] - NAKAGAWA, SUSUMU ET AL, "(Quinoliziniumyl)thiomethylcephems as antibacterial agents and their preparation", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900716), vol. 113, no. 3, Database accession no. 23525r, XP002100713 [X] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS 12TH COLLECTIVE INDEX., COLUMBUS US, pages 16012F - 16168F, XP002100712 [ ] * 4-[5-methoxy-4-(phenylmethoxy)-2- pyridinyl]-3-buten-2-one : CAS RN 127639-69-4 * * 4-[5-methoxy-4-(phenylmethoxy)-2- pyridinyl]-3-buten-2-ol: CAS RN 127639-70-7 * | International search | [A]JPS59225171 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO); | [A]JPS61271268 (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO); | [A]JPH06508125 | [A] - JOURNAL OF CHEMOTHERAPY, 1995, Vol. 36, Suppl. B, HAENEY M., "The Immunological Background to Transplantation", p. 1-9. | [A] - INT. J. OF IMMUNOPHARMAC., 1995, Vol. 17, No. 2, ISHIZUKA M., KAWATETSU M., YAMASHITA T., UENO M., "Low Molecular Weight Immunomodulators Produced by Microorganisms", p. 133-139. | [A] - CURRENT OPINION IN GASTROENTEROLOGY, 1995, Vol. 11, STEVENS A.C., SHAH S.A., BOUSBAROS A., "Immunosuppressive Agents in Gastrointestinal Disease", p. 554-561. |