EP1026736 - SEMICONDUCTOR INTEGRATED CIRCUIT DEVICE WITH ITS LAYOUT DESIGNED BY THE CELL BASE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2005 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2006 [2006/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKAMOTO, Yasushi, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3. Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/32] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97905482.2 | 11.03.1997 | [2000/32] | WO1997JP00763 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9840913 | Date: | 17.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1026736 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.09.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/82, H01L27/118 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
H01L27/118 (EP,US);
H01L27/0207 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/32] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTES HALBLEITERSCHALTKREISBAUELEMENT DESSEN ANORDNUNG MITTELS GRUNDZELLENVERFAHREN ENTORFEN WURDE | [2000/32] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR INTEGRATED CIRCUIT DEVICE WITH ITS LAYOUT DESIGNED BY THE CELL BASE METHOD | [2000/32] | French: | CIRCUIT INTEGRE A SEMI-CONDUCTEURS DONT L'IMPLANTATION EST CON UE AU NIVEAU DES CELLULES | [2000/32] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.1999 | Translation filed | 10.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.1999 | Search fee paid | 10.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 10.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 15.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/04] | 29.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 11.10.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.11.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH07130858 ; | [X]JPS57190343 ; | [X]JPS6052040 ; | [X]EP0322419 (HIRSCH GREGORY) [X] 1,4-7 * abstract * * column 13, line 26 - column 15, line 60 * * column 23, line 20 - column 24, line 18 *; | [XY]US5157618 (RAVINDRA H [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7 * column 10, line 49 - column 12, line 16 * * column 13, line 57 - column 14, line 39; figures 5,6 * [Y] 2,3 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 1995, no. 08, & JP07130858 A 19950519 (FUJITSU LTD) [Y] 2,3 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830215), vol. 007, no. 036, Database accession no. (E - 158), & JP57190343 A 19821122 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1,4-7 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850726), vol. 009, no. 181, Database accession no. (E - 331), & JP60052040 A 19850323 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1,4-7 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS5878450 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JPH06338603 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [Y]JPH07130858 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]JPH07153926 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [Y]JPH07235600 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) |