EP0956372 - AUSTENITIC STAINLESS STEEL AND USE OF THE STEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): SE | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandvik Aktiebolag (publ) 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [1999/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDEN, Johan Krikonvägen 18 S-806 36 Gävle / SE | 02 /
ROSEN, Jonas Smältostvägen 5 S-811 38 Sandviken / SE | [2001/19] |
Former [1999/46] | 01 /
LIND N, Johan Krikonvägen 18 S-806 36 Gävle / SE | ||
02 /
ROS N, Jonas Smältostvägen 5 S-811 38 Sandviken / SE | Representative(s) | Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel, et al Sandvik AB Patent Department 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | Taquist, Lennart, et al Sandvik AB Patent Department 811 81 SANDVIKEN / SE | Application number, filing date | 97905542.3 | 20.02.1997 | [1999/46] | WO1997SE00292 | Priority number, date | SE19960000709 | 26.02.1996 Original published format: SE 9600709 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9731130 | Date: | 28.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956372 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0956372 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/58, C22C38/48, C22C38/50 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
C22C38/50 (EP,US);
C22C38/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/46] | Title | German: | ROSTFREIER AUSTENITISCHER STAHL UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [1999/46] | English: | AUSTENITIC STAINLESS STEEL AND USE OF THE STEEL | [1999/46] | French: | ACIER AUSTENITIQUE INOXYDABLE ET UTILISATION DE CET ACIER | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 19.08.1998 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 18.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.02.2002
31.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE Edelstahl Witten Krefeld GmbH Auestr. 4 58452 Witten / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack, et al, et al Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.02.2002
Edelstahl Witten Krefeld GmbH Auestr. 4 58452 Witten / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 40435 Düsseldorf / DE | 05.05.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.11.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 26.06.2005 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   06.03.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 19.06.2002 | SE | 19.06.2002 | [2008/40] |
Former [2006/31] | SE | 09.08.2001 | |
FR | 19.06.2002 | ||
Former [2002/23] | deleted | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 09.08.2001 | Cited in | International search | [X]SU1038377 (SP K TEKHN B FIZ MEKH I AN USS [SU]) |