EP0883389 - THE ANATOMIC REPLACEMENT PROSTHESIS SYSTEM IN THE HAND AND WRIST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.11.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Refusal of application | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ege, Ahmet Inönü Cad. 166. sok. No: 2/19 35360 Hatay-Izmir / TR | [1998/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Postfach 3055 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97905554.8 | 20.02.1997 | [1998/51] | WO1997TR00004 | Priority number, date | TR19160000396 | 29.02.1996 Original published format: TR 16396 | [1998/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9731593 | Date: | 04.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0883389 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 04.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/42 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
A61F2/4261 (EP,US);
A61B17/86 (EP,US);
A61F2/30767 (EP,US);
A61F2/4241 (EP,US);
A61F2/4606 (EP,US);
A61F2002/2835 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30153 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30253 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30383 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30433 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30507 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30579 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30594 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30604 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30772 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30777 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30878 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0041 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0019 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0076 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/51] | Extension states | AL | 29.08.1998 | LT | 29.08.1998 | LV | 29.08.1998 | RO | 29.08.1998 | SI | 29.08.1998 | Title | German: | PROTHESENSYSTEM ZUM ANATOMISCHEN ERSATZ VON DER HAND UND DEM HANDGELENK | [1998/51] | English: | THE ANATOMIC REPLACEMENT PROSTHESIS SYSTEM IN THE HAND AND WRIST | [1998/51] | French: | SYSTEME PROTHETIQUE DE REMPLACEMENT ANATOMIQUE POUR LA MAIN ET LE POIGNET | [1998/51] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 29.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 28.04.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 29.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/03] | 24.07.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.08.2003 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/03] | Request for further processing for: | 24.09.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 24.09.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4936854 (SWANSON ALFRED B [US]); | [X]EP0607749 (SULZER MEDIZINALTECHNIK AG [CH], et al); | [X]EP0198586 (DOW CORNING WRIGHT CORP [US]); | [X]GB2269752 (HOUSE HOMER CHARLES [US]); | [X]FR2673100 (HERZBERG GUILLAUME, et al); | [A]US5458646 (GIACHINO A ALAN [CA], et al); | [A]US5413609 (NICOL ALEXANDER C [GB], et al) |