EP0954633 - VACUUM ISOLATED DEWATERING METHOD AND UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: FR | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermo Fibertek Inc. 81 Wyman Street Waltham, MA 02254 / US | For all designated states SMURFIT CARTON Y PAPEL DE MEXICO, S.A. DE C.V. Jaime Balmes No. 11-D, Col. Los Morales Polanco México, D.F. 11050 / MX | [1999/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CABRERA Y LOPEZ CARAM, Luis Fernando Meleleucas No. 173, Lomas de Cuernavaca Cuevernaca, Morelos 62050 / MX | 02 /
BACHAND, Jeffrey, P. 32 Helen Drive Queensbury, NY 12804 / US | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Robert Patrick, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Jackson, Robert Patrick, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1999/45] | Leale, Robin George Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97905722.1 | 11.02.1997 | [1999/45] | WO1997US01677 | Priority number, date | US19960600833 | 13.02.1996 Original published format: US 600833 | [1999/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9730213 | Date: | 21.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0954633 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0954633 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.08.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/48, D21F1/54 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
D21F1/20 (EP,US);
D21F1/483 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VAKUUM-ENTWÄSSERUNG | [1999/45] | English: | VACUUM ISOLATED DEWATERING METHOD AND UNIT | [1999/45] | French: | UNITE D'ESSORAGE ISOLEE PAR UN VIDE ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT | [1999/45] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.1998 | Search fee paid | 25.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.08.1998 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 30.01.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 18.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Request for further processing for: | 10.06.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 10.06.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.06.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 24.11.2004 | IT | 24.11.2004 | DK | 24.02.2005 | SE | 24.02.2005 | [2013/07] |
Former [2008/07] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
FR | 24.11.2004 | ||
IT | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/17] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
FR | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
FR | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 24.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO9810139 (SMURFIT CARTON Y PAPEL MEXICO [MX]) [E] 1,5,9,18,27,29,34,43 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9530048 (SMURFIT CARTON Y PAPEL MEXICO [MX], et al) [A] 16,33,53 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US3573159 (SEPALL OLA); | [X]US4687549 (KALLMES OTTO J [US]); | [Y]US5242547 (CORBELLINI GLAUCO [IT], et al); | [Y]US4957598 (CORBELLINI GLAUCO [IT]); | [Y]US4315799 (TUREK MITCHELL C, et al); | [Y]US3549487 (CLARK RAYMOND C); | [Y]US4789433 (FUCHS KARL-DIETER [DE]); | [A]US4838996 (KALLMES OTTO J [US]); | [A]US4123322 (HOULT DAVID P); | [A]US3598694 (WIEBE PHILIP) |