|
21.02.2007 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
28.12.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2006 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2006 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.11.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
25.10.2006 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.10.2006 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.10.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.09.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.07.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.05.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2006 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2006 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the EP procedure |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
28.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.01.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.06.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.06.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
05.05.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.1998 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1998 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.08.1998 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.08.1998 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.1998 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.1998 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.03.1998 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.1998 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.09.1997 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.1997 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
54 |