EP0891371 - 9-OXIMESILYL ERYTHROMYCIN A DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2004 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states Abbott Laboratories Chad 0377/AP6D-2, 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KU, Yi-Yin 493 Satinwood Terr. Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US | [1999/03] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97905826.0 | 06.02.1997 | [1999/03] | WO1997US01955 | Priority number, date | US19960626524 | 02.04.1996 Original published format: US 626524 | [1999/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9736913 | Date: | 09.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0891371 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0891371 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07H17/08 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
C07H17/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/03] | Title | German: | 9-OXIMSILYL ERYTHROMYCIN A DERIVATE | [1999/03] | English: | 9-OXIMESILYL ERYTHROMYCIN A DERIVATIVES | [1999/03] | French: | DERIVES D'ERYTHROMYCINE A | [1999/03] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/03] | 15.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 25.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49] | Request for further processing for: | 15.01.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.02.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0195960 (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [X]US4640910 (FAUBL HERMANN [US], et al) [X] 9* example 11 *; | [D]US4670549 (MORIMOTO SHIGEO [JP], et al); | [AD]EP0260938 (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1 * claim - *; | [A]EP0272110 (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 3-5 *; | [AD] - WATANABE Y. ET AL, "Chemical Modification of Erythromycins. IX.", JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS., TOKYO JP, (199304), vol. 46, no. 4, pages 647 - 660, XP002036051 [AD] 1 * page 648 * |