EP0897373 - MESOPOROUS MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.02.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smart (Isle Of Man) Limited Unicorn Chambers, 45 Victoria Street Douglas IM1 2LD / GB | [2000/49] |
Former [1999/08] | For all designated states Bratton, Graham John 154 Old Farm Avenue Sidcup, Kent DA15 8AL / GB | ||
For all designated states Buck, Karon Doreen Alancroft, Kingsfield Road West Kingsdown, Kent TN15 6LH / GB | |||
For all designated states Naylor, Timothy De Villiers 10 Kingswood Close Englefield Green, Surrey TW2 0NQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRATTON, Graham John 30 Cavendish Avenue Sidcup, Kent DA15 9EB / GB | 02 /
NAYLOR, Timothy De Villiers 10 Kingswood Close Egham, Surrey TW20 0NQ / GB | 03 /
BUCK, Karon Doreen 2 Calais Cottages, Three Gates Road Fawkham, Kent, DA3 8NY / GB | [2000/49] |
Former [1999/08] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald, et al Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | Lucas, Brian Ronald, et al Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | ||
Former [1999/08] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97906275.9 | 07.03.1997 | [1999/08] | WO1997GB00635 | Priority number, date | GB19960006002 | 08.03.1996 Original published format: GB 9606002 | [1999/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9732815 | Date: | 12.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0897373 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C01B37/02, C01B37/00 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
B01J20/103 (EP);
B01D71/027 (EP);
C01B37/00 (EP);
C01B37/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/08] | Title | German: | MESOPORÖSES MATERIAL | [1999/08] | English: | MESOPOROUS MATERIAL | [1999/08] | French: | MATERIAU MESOPOREUX | [1999/08] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.08.1998 | Examination requested [1999/08] | 01.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/14] | 29.10.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9111390 (MOBIL OIL CORPORATION) [A] 8 * example 7 * * page 47, line 8 *; | [DA]US5108725 ; | [A]US5143879 (D. D. WHITEHURST) [A] 8 * examples 7,8 * * see column 35 : table *; | [A]WO9530625 (SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. ET AL.) [A] 8 * examples I-IV *; | [DA]GB2269377 (THE BRITISH PETROLEUM COMPANY PLC ET AL.) |