EP0891394 - BASIC MONOAZO COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/03] | IMPROVED BASIC MONOAZO COMPOUNDS | ||
[2001/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant Finance (BVI) Limited Citco Building, Wickhams Cay, P.O. Box 662 Road Town, Tortola / VG | [2000/41] |
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states CLARIANT INTERNATIONAL LTD. Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEDRAZZI, Reinhard Grabenmattweg 59/7 CH-4123 Allschwil / CH | [1999/03] | Representative(s) | D'haemer, Jan Constant, et al Clariant International Ltd. Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz 1 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | D'haemer, Jan Constant, et al Clariant International Ltd., Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz 1 / CH | Application number, filing date | 97906325.2 | 25.03.1997 | [1999/03] | WO1997IB00294 | Priority number, date | GB19960006453 | 27.03.1996 Original published format: GB 9606453 | [1999/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9735925 | Date: | 02.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0891394 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0891394 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09B29/30, C09B43/16 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
C09B29/0003 (EP);
C09B29/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/03] | Title | German: | BASISCHE MONOAZOVERBINDUNGEN | [2001/39] | English: | BASIC MONOAZO COMPOUNDS | [2001/39] | French: | COMPOSES MONOAZO BASIQUES | [2001/39] |
Former [1999/03] | VERBESSERTE BASISCHE MONOAZOVERBINDUNGEN | ||
Former [1999/03] | IMPROVED BASIC MONOAZO COMPOUNDS | ||
Former [1999/03] | COMPOSES MONOAZO BASIQUES AMELIORES | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.08.1998 | Examination requested [1999/03] | 27.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3625576 (SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH) [A] 1-10 * page 4, line 35 - line 40; example 32 *; | [A]DE2915323 (SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH) [A] 1-10 * example 79; table 5 *; | [A]EP0194885 (TAOKA CHEMICAL CO. LTD.) [A] 1 * abstract * |