EP0883769 - METHOD OF PREPARING A MULTILAYER PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/51] | MULTILAYER PIPE | ||
[2002/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOREALIS A/S Lyngby Hovedgade 96 2800 Lyngby / DK | [1998/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EK, Carl-Gustaf Tigerstigen 19 S-426 72 Västra Frölunda / SE | 02 /
MALM, Bo Harjuviita 16 A 27 FIN-02110 Espoo / FI | 03 /
NYMARK, Anders Kahdeksantoistamäenkuja 5 FIN-06100 Porvoo / FI | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Wiklund, Erik, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [1998/51] | Application number, filing date | 97906405.2 | 03.03.1997 | [1998/51] | WO1997SE00344 | Priority number, date | SE19960000826 | 04.03.1996 Original published format: SE 9600826 | FI19960001722 | 19.04.1996 Original published format: FI 961722 | [1998/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9733117 | Date: | 12.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0883769 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0883769 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 12.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16L9/133 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
F16L9/133 (EP,US);
F16L11/04 (EP,US);
F16L57/02 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1393 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31909 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31913 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MEHRSCHICHTIGEN ROHRLEITUNG | [2002/43] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARING A MULTILAYER PIPE | [2002/43] | French: | PROCEDE A FABRIQUER UNE CONDUITE A PLUSIEURS COUCHES | [2002/43] |
Former [1998/51] | MEHRSCHICHTIGE ROHRLEITUNG | ||
Former [1998/51] | MULTILAYER PIPE | ||
Former [1998/51] | CONDUITE A PLUSIEURS COUCHES | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 25.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 13.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.05.2003 | BE | 02.05.2003 | CH | 02.05.2003 | FI | 02.05.2003 | LI | 02.05.2003 | NL | 02.05.2003 | DK | 02.08.2003 | GR | 02.08.2003 | SE | 02.08.2003 | PT | 04.08.2003 | ES | 13.08.2003 | [2004/28] |
Former [2004/23] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
CH | 02.05.2003 | ||
FI | 02.05.2003 | ||
LI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
DK | 02.08.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
CH | 02.05.2003 | ||
FI | 02.05.2003 | ||
LI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
CH | 02.05.2003 | ||
LI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 02.05.2003 | |
LI | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 02.05.2003 | |
LI | 02.05.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 02.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9100466 (JONACO GMBH [CH]); | [A]DE4202399 ; | [A]DE4202397 ; | [A]EP0659534 (INVENTA AG [CH]); | [A]GB2289108 (HEPWORTH BUILDING PROD [GB]) |