EP0883609 - SELECTIVE D1 DOPAMINE RECEPTOR AGONISTS AND PARTIAL AGONISTS/ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2000 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmeco Laboratories, Inc. 128 Spring Street Lexington, MA 02173 / US | [1998/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FROIMOWITZ, Mark 90 Eastbourne Road Newton, MA 02159 / US | 02 /
BELLOTT, Emile, Melvin 4 York Terrace Beverly, MA 01915 / US | 03 /
STEVENSON, Robert 24 Winchester Drive Lexington, MA 02173 / US | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Harvey, David Gareth Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | Harvey, David Gareth Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 97906688.3 | 19.02.1997 | [1998/51] | WO1997US02620 | Priority number, date | US19960606393 | 23.02.1996 Original published format: US 606393 | [1998/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9730977 | Date: | 28.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0883609 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D221/18, C07C215/64, C07C217/74, A61K31/44, A61K31/135 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
A61K31/00 (EP);
A61K31/435 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
C07C215/64 (EP);
C07C217/74 (EP);
C07D221/18 (EP);
C07C2603/32 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/51] | Title | German: | SELEKTIVE D1 DOPAMINE REZEPTOR AGONISTEN UND PARTIELLE AGONISTEN/ANTAGONISTEN | [1998/51] | English: | SELECTIVE D1 DOPAMINE RECEPTOR AGONISTS AND PARTIAL AGONISTS/ANTAGONISTS | [1998/51] | French: | AGONISTES SELECTIFS ET AGONISTES/ANTAGONISTES PARTIELS DU RECEPTEUR DE LA DOPAMINE D1 | [1998/51] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.09.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 14.02.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9012574 (UNIV NORTHEASTERN [US]) [A] 1-32 * claim - *; | [A]US3992445 (ENGELHARDT EDWARD L) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [X] - DAVID L.LADD ET AL, "Synthesis and dopaminergic binding of 2-Aryldopamine analogues:Phenethylamines,3-Benzazepines,and 9-(aminomethyl)fluorenes", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON US, (198610), vol. 29, no. 10, pages 1904 - 1912, XP002031848 [X] 17-19,25,26,29-31 * see page 1908,compounds 33a,33b,4a,4b and experimental section and page 1912 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00160a018 | [A] - SCOTT E.SNYDER ET AL, "Synthesis and evaluation of 6,7-dihydroxy-2,3,4,8,9,13b-hexahydro-1H-benzo[6,7]cyclohepta[1,2,3-ef][3]benzazepine,6,7-dihydroxy-1,2,3,4,8,12b-hexahydroanthr[10,4a,4cd]azepine,and 10-(aminomethyl)-9,10-dihydro-1,2-dihydroxyanthracene as conformationally restricted analogs of beta-phenyldopamine", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON US, (199506), vol. 38, no. 13, pages 2395 - 2408, XP002031849 [A] 1-32 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00013a015 |