EP0932847 - EYEWEAR AND NOSEPAD FOR USE WITH EYEWEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sentinel Importing Corporation 125 Charles Street North Vancouver British Colombia V7H 1S1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states Sentinel Importing Corporation 125 Charles Street North Vancouver, British Colombia V7H 1S1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Brent, R. 435 West 27th Street North Vancouver, British Columbia V7N 2H7 / CA | 02 /
SULLIVAN, Sean, G. 4541 - 219th Street Langley, British Columbia V3A 8E3 / CA | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Haecker, Walter Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | Haecker, Walter, Dipl.-Phys. Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 97906954.9 | 18.03.1997 | [1999/31] | WO1997CA00181 | Priority number, date | US19960730784 | 16.10.1996 Original published format: US 730784 | [1999/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9816861 | Date: | 23.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0932847 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0932847 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02C5/12 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
G02C5/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/31] | Title | German: | BRILLE UND NASENAUFLAGETEIL ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT BRILLEN | [1999/31] | English: | EYEWEAR AND NOSEPAD FOR USE WITH EYEWEAR | [1999/31] | French: | LUNETTES ET PLAQUETTE NASALE A UTILISER AVEC CES LUNETTES | [1999/31] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/31] | 22.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37] | Request for further processing for: | 21.03.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 21.03.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.04.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   05.04.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.09.2003 | BE | 17.09.2003 | CH | 17.09.2003 | FR | 17.09.2003 | IT | 17.09.2003 | LI | 17.09.2003 | NL | 17.09.2003 | DK | 17.12.2003 | SE | 17.12.2003 | DE | 18.12.2003 | ES | 28.12.2003 | GB | 18.03.2004 | IE | 18.03.2004 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
BE | 17.09.2003 | ||
CH | 17.09.2003 | ||
FR | 17.09.2003 | ||
LI | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
DK | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
DE | 18.12.2003 | ||
ES | 28.12.2003 | ||
GB | 18.03.2004 | ||
IE | 18.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
BE | 17.09.2003 | ||
CH | 17.09.2003 | ||
LI | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
DK | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
DE | 18.12.2003 | ||
ES | 28.12.2003 | ||
GB | 18.03.2004 | ||
IE | 18.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
BE | 17.09.2003 | ||
CH | 17.09.2003 | ||
LI | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
DK | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
DE | 18.12.2003 | ||
ES | 28.12.2003 | ||
IE | 18.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
BE | 17.09.2003 | ||
CH | 17.09.2003 | ||
LI | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
DK | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
DE | 18.12.2003 | ||
ES | 28.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
BE | 17.09.2003 | ||
CH | 17.09.2003 | ||
LI | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
DK | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
DE | 18.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
BE | 17.09.2003 | ||
CH | 17.09.2003 | ||
LI | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
DK | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
BE | 17.09.2003 | ||
CH | 17.09.2003 | ||
LI | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
CH | 17.09.2003 | ||
LI | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | NL | 17.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE285575 (M. WESENIGK) [A] 1,3,12,18* page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 10 *; | [A]US3701592 (FERNANDEZ JOSE J) [A] 1,12,18,20 * column 2, line 36 - line 44 *; | [A]DE3130144 (KRUECKELS HANNES, et al) [A] 1,12,18 * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 8 *; | [A]GB2162958 (GREENHALGH ALAN) [A] 1-5,8,9,12 * page 1, line 31 - line 62 *; | [A]US4787729 (RUFFEN KENNETH T [US]) [A] 1-5,8,9,12-16 * column 1, line 39 - column 4, line 13 *; | [A]DE9004468U (I. SCHMOLZ) [A] 1,2,9,12 * page 5, line 7 - page 6, line 5 * |