EP0894137 - NOVEL HUMAN MYELOID TERMINAL DIFFERENTIATION RESPONSE GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INCYTE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 3174 Porter Drive Palo Alto CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states INCYTE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 3174 Porter Drive Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COCKS, Benjamin, Graeme 4292 D Wilke Way Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
AU-YOUNG, Janice 1419 Kains Avenue Berkeley, CA 94702 / US | 03 /
SEILHAMER, Jeffrey, J. 12555 La Cresta Los Altos Hills, CA 94022 / US | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 97907656.9 | 14.02.1997 | [1999/05] | WO1997US02458 | Priority number, date | US19960602208 | 15.02.1996 Original published format: US 602208 | [1999/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9730157 | Date: | 21.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0894137 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/19, C12N15/11, C12N15/85, C12N5/10, C12Q1/68, C07K16/24, A61K38/19, A61K48/00, G01N33/53, C07K14/47 | [1999/05] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/05] | Title | German: | MENSCHLICHES GEN, WELSCHES IN RAHMEN DER MYELOIDEN ZELLDIFFERENZIERUNG AKTIVERT WIRD | [1999/05] | English: | NOVEL HUMAN MYELOID TERMINAL DIFFERENTIATION RESPONSE GENE | [1999/05] | French: | NOUVEAU GENE DE REPONSE A LA DIFFERENCIATION TERMINALE MYELOIDE D'ORIGINE HUMAINE | [1999/05] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.08.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 24.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/14] | 21.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9411533 (US HEALTH [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0356180 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [A] 16-19 * the whole document *; | [XD] - ADAMS M. ET AL., "AC T29941", EMBL DATABASE, HEIDELBERG, (19950109), XP002033953 [XD] 1,2 * the whole document * | [XDY] - ADAMS M. ET AL., "AC M77995", EMBL DATABASE, HEIDELBERG, (19920222), XP002033954 [XD] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 3-6,12,14,15 | [YD] - SELVAKUMARAN M. ET AL., "The novel primary response gene MyD118 and the protooncogenes myb, myc, and bcl-2 modulate transforming growth factor beta1-induced apoptosis of myeloid leukemia cells", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (199404), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 2352 - 2360, XP000676663 [YD] 3-6,14,15 * the whole document * | [YD] - ZHAN Q. ET AL., "The gadd and MyD genes define a novel set of mammalian genes encoding acidic proteins that synergistically suppress cell growth", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (199404), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 2361 - 2371, XP000676678 [YD] 12 * the whole document * | [AD] - ABDOLLAHI A. ET AL., "Sequence and expression of a cDNA encoding MyD118: a novel myeloid differentiation primary response gene induced by multiple cytokines", ONCOGENE, (199101), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 165 - 167, XP000676665 [AD] 1-5 * the whole document * | [AD] - LIEBERMANN D. AND HOFFMAN B., "Differentiation primary response genes and proto-oncogenes as positive and negative regulators of terminal hematopoetic cell differentiation", STEM CELLS, (1994), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 352 - 369, XP000676664 [AD] 1-20 * see esp. pp. 358-60 * | [PX] - HILLIER L. ET AL., "AC AA194908", EMBL DATABASE, HEIDELBERG, (19970125), XP002033955 [PX] 1,2 * the whole document * | [T] - VAIRAPANDI M. ET AL., "The differentiation primary response gene MyD118, related to GADD45, encodes for a nuclear protein which interacts with PCNA and P21(WAF1/CIP1)", ONCOGENE, (19960620), vol. 12, no. 12, pages 2579 - 2594, XP000676666 [T] 11,12 * see esp. p. 2587/88, p.2584-86 * |