EP0889705 - CATHETER APPARATUS FOR GENERATING A FISTULA ON-DEMAND BETWEEN CLOSELY ASSOCIATED BLOOD VESSELS AT A PRE-CHOSEN ANATOMIC SITE IN-VIVO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/02] | CATHETER APPARATUS AND METHODOLOGY FOR GENERATING A FISTULA ON-DEMAND BETWEEN CLOSELY ASSOCIATED BLOOD VESSELS AT A PRE-CHOSEN ANATOMIC SITE IN-VIVO | ||
[2009/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center 330 Brookline Avenue Boston, MA 02215 / US | For all designated states Cohn, William E. 104 Lagrange Chestnut Hill, MA 02167 / US | For all designated states Kim, Ducksoo 9 Cedarhill Road Dover, MA 02030 / US | [1999/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHN, William, E. 104 Lagrange Chestnut Hill, MA 02167 / US | 02 /
KIM, Ducksoo 9 Cedarhill Road Dover, MA 02030 / US | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen, et al W.P. Thompson & Co, 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/10] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [1999/02] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 97907789.8 | 21.02.1997 | [1999/02] | WO1997US02800 | Priority number, date | US19960616588 | 15.03.1996 Original published format: US 616588 | [1999/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9733522 | Date: | 18.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0889705 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0889705 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.09.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
A61B17/3207 (EP,US);
A61B17/11 (EP,US);
A61B17/320783 (EP,US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B17/320016 (EP,US);
A61B18/1815 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1999/02] | Title | German: | KATHETERVORRICHTUNG ZUM AUF ABRUF IN-VIVO ERZEUGEN EINER FISTEL ZWISCHEN BENACHBARTEN BLUTGEFÄSSEN AN EINEM VORGEWÄHLTEN ANATOMISCHEN ORT | [2009/17] | English: | CATHETER APPARATUS FOR GENERATING A FISTULA ON-DEMAND BETWEEN CLOSELY ASSOCIATED BLOOD VESSELS AT A PRE-CHOSEN ANATOMIC SITE IN-VIVO | [2009/17] | French: | CATHETER POUR CREER UNE FISTULE SUR DEMANDE ENTRE DES VAISSEAUX SANGUINS PROCHES AU NIVEAU D'UN SITE ANATOMIQUE PRESELECTIONNE IN VIVO | [2009/17] |
Former [1999/02] | KATHETERVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN ZUM AUF ABRUF IN-VIVO ERZEUGEN EINER FISTEL ZWISCHEN BENACHBARTEN BLUTGEFÄSSEN AN EINEM VORGEWÄHLTEN ANATOMISCHEN ORT | ||
Former [1999/02] | CATHETER APPARATUS AND METHODOLOGY FOR GENERATING A FISTULA ON-DEMAND BETWEEN CLOSELY ASSOCIATED BLOOD VESSELS AT A PRE-CHOSEN ANATOMIC SITE IN-VIVO | ||
Former [1999/02] | CATHETER ET METHODOLOGIE POUR CREER UNE FISTULE SUR DEMANDE ENTRE DES VAISSEAUX SANGUINS PROCHES AU NIVEAU D'UN SITE ANATOMIQUE PRESELECTIONNE IN VIVO | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.1998 | Search fee paid | 15.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 12.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 21.02.2010 | [2011/28] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5353807 (DEMARCO THOMAS J [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 7, line 38 - line 58; figures 1a,1c * * column 8, line 9 - line 17 * * column 8, line 37 - line 43 * * column 9, line 40 - line 53 * * column 12, line 30 - line 45 *; | [X]US5429131 (SCHEINMAN MELVIN M [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 7, line 12 - line 35; figures 2A-2D ** column 8, line 38 - line 42 * | International search | [A]US4874360 (GOLDBERG JAY R [US], et al); | [A]US5087256 (TAYLOR JAMES M [US], et al); | [X]US5353807 (DEMARCO THOMAS J [US]) |