|
22.01.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
23 |
|
11.08.2011 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
22 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2011 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.05.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.05.2011 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2010 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
55 |
|
10.08.2009 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.07.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2009 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
9 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
9 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
9 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
10.02.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.01.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
67 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
27 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.11.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
28.11.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
04.07.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.06.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
17 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2004 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2004 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
25.10.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.10.2004 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.10.2004 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.10.2004 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.04.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.04.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2003 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
03.04.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
07.10.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.09.2002 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.09.2002 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
103 |
|
30.01.2002 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.01.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
04.01.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
02.01.2002 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
24.10.2001 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.12.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
28.12.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.12.2000 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.05.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
02.05.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
02.05.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.04.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.05.1999 |
Request for accelerated examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.1999 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.1999 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.1999 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.1998 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
27.10.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
27.10.1998 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.1998 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.10.1998 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
28.10.1997 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.09.1997 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.09.1997 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
148 |
|
25.09.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
25.09.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |