EP0885466 - LOW COST STABLE AIR ELECTRODE MATERIAL FOR HIGH TEMPERATURE SOLID OXIDE ELECTROLYTE ELECTROCHEMICAL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Westinghouse Power Corporation 4400 N. Alafaya Trl. Orlando, FL 32826 / US | [1999/26] |
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUO, Lewis, J., H. Apartment 314, 100 Oxford Drive Monroeville, PA 15146 / US | 02 /
SINGH, Prabhakar 2227 Woodmont Drive Export, PA 15632 / US | 03 /
RUKA, Roswell, J. 51 Churchill Road Pittsburgh, PA 15235 / US | 04 /
VASILOW, Theodore, R. 445 Manor Road Delmont, PA 15626 / US | 05 /
BRATTON, Raymond, J. 445 Manor Road Delmont, PA 15626 / US | [1998/52] | Representative(s) | Shaya, Darrin Maurice Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | Shaya, Darrin Maurice Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97908745.9 | 27.02.1997 | [1998/52] | WO1997US03019 | Priority number, date | US19960608889 | 29.02.1996 Original published format: US 608889 | [1998/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9732349 | Date: | 04.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0885466 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0885466 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/88, H01M8/12, C04B35/01, H01M4/86 | [1998/52] | CPC: |
H01M4/9033 (EP,US);
H01M4/88 (KR);
C04B35/016 (EP,US);
H01M4/8621 (EP,US);
H01M4/8885 (EP,US);
H01M4/9016 (EP,US);
H01M2004/8689 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1293 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0074 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/52] | Title | German: | KOSTENGÜNSTIGES STABILES LUFTELEKTRODEMATERIAL FÜR HOCHTEMPERATUR-FESTOXID ELEKTROCHEMISCHE ZELLEN | [2001/37] | English: | LOW COST STABLE AIR ELECTRODE MATERIAL FOR HIGH TEMPERATURE SOLID OXIDE ELECTROLYTE ELECTROCHEMICAL CELLS | [1998/52] | French: | MATERIAU D'ELECTRODE OXYDOREDUCTRICE, STABLE ET PEU COUTEUX, POUR PILES ELECTROCHIMIQUES A ELECTROLYTES OXYDES SOLIDES FONCTIONNANT A HAUTE TEMPERATURE | [1998/52] |
Former [1998/52] | KOSTGÜNSTIGES STABILES LUFTELEKTRODEMATERIAL FÜR HOCHTEMPERATUR-FESTOXID ELEKTROCHEMISCHE ZELLEN | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/52] | 04.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 12.09.2001 | NL | 12.09.2001 | DK | 12.12.2001 | SE | 12.12.2001 | ES | 26.03.2002 | [2004/16] |
Former [2004/04] | BE | 12.09.2001 | |
NL | 12.09.2001 | ||
DK | 12.12.2001 | ||
ES | 26.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | BE | 12.09.2001 | |
NL | 12.09.2001 | ||
DK | 12.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | BE | 12.09.2001 | |
NL | 12.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/29] | BE | 12.09.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH07138069 ; | [A]JPH042609 ; | [A]EP0593281 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 12 * page 2, line 27 - line 37; claims 1,4 *; | [A]DE4406276 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [A] 12,13,19,20 * claims 5,9,12 * * example 5; table 8 * * page 5, line 43 - line 49 * * page 7, line 50 - line 64 *; | [A]EP0633619 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] * claims 1,5 *; | [A]EP0641749 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 12 * page 4, line 18 - line 58; claims 1-8,10,11,13 * * page 5, line 17 - line 21 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 095, no. 008, & JP07138069 A 19950530 (CENTRAL RES INST OF ELECTRIC POWER IND;OTHERS: 01) [A] 12 * abstract * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19951016), vol. 123, no. 16, Database accession no. 204350 [ ] * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 07, Database accession no. 92-054142, XP002034123 & JPH042609 A 19920107 (SHINETSU CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920518), vol. 116, no. 20, Database accession no. 197097 [ ] * abstract * |