EP0881646 - SELF-FUSIBLE INSULATED WIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0005 / JP | ||
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0005 / JP | ||
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAMINE, Seiichi 22-7, Sakamoto 7-chome,Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0113 / JP | 02 /
NISHITA, Shigeo 1-1, Hieitsuji 2-chome,Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0104 / JP | 03 /
UKAWA, Takeshi 6-12, Shigasato 2-chome,Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0006 / JP | 04 /
TAMURA, Kazushige 1-1, Hieitsuji 2-chome,Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0104 / JP | [2005/38] |
Former [2005/30] | 01 /
NAGAMINE, Seiichi 22-7, Sakamoto 7-chome,Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0113 / JP | ||
02 /
NISHIDA, Shigeo 1-1, Hieitsuji 2-chome,Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0104 / JP | |||
03 /
UKAWA, Takeshi 6-12, Shigasato 2-chome,Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0006 / JP | |||
04 /
TAMURA, Kazushige 1-1, Hieitsuji 2-chome,Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0104 / JP | |||
Former [1998/49] | 01 /
NAGAMINE, Seiichi 22-7, Sakamoto 7-chome,Otsu-shi Shiga 520-01 / JP | ||
02 /
NISHIDA, Shigeo 1-1, Hieitsuji 2-chome,Otsu-shi Shiga 520-01 / JP | |||
03 /
UKAWA, Takeshi 6-12, Shigasato 2-chome,Otsu-shi Shiga 520 / JP | |||
04 /
TAMURA, Kazushige 1-1, Hieitsuji 2-chome,Otsu-shi Shiga 520-01 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/49] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97909622.9 | 23.10.1997 | [1998/49] | WO1997JP03865 | Priority number, date | JP19960311962 | 22.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31196296 | JP19960322688 | 03.12.1996 Original published format: JP 32268896 | [1998/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9822955 | Date: | 28.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0881646 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0881646 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.05.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01B7/02, H01B3/30, C09D177/06, C09J177/06, C08L77/06, H01F5/06, H01J29/76, C09D177/00 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
H01J9/236 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (EP,US);
C08L77/06 (EP,US);
C09D177/00 (EP,US);
C09D177/06 (EP,US);
H01B3/305 (EP,US);
H01F41/12 (EP,US);
H01F5/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2933 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L77/00, C08L77/00 (EP,US);
C08L77/06, C08L77/00 (US,EP);
C09D177/00, C08L77/00 (US,EP);
C09D177/06, C08L77/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1998/49] | H01B7/02, H01B3/30, C09D177/06, C09J177/06, C08L77/06, H01F5/06, H01J29/76 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1998/49] | Title | German: | SELBSTSBINDENDER ISOLIERTER DRAHT | [2005/32] | English: | SELF-FUSIBLE INSULATED WIRE | [1998/49] | French: | CABLE ISOLE AUTO-FUSIBLE | [1998/49] |
Former [1998/49] | AUTOSCHMELZBARER ISOLIERTER DARHT | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.1998 | Translation filed | 12.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.1998 | Search fee paid | 12.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 05.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3975571 (KAWAGUCHI MUNETAKA, et al) [X] 1-3,5-8 * column 3, lines 15-33; claims 1-11 * * column 4, lines 6-61 *; | [A]US4420536 (SAUNDERS HOLLIS S [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * example 2; claims 1-5 * | International search | [X]JPH08249936 (TOTOKU ELECTRIC); | [Y]JPS50158886 ; | [Y]JPH0632877 (UNION CAMP CORP) |