EP0946326 - METHOD OF PRODUCING MATING PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HÖGANÄS AB 263 83 Höganäs / SE | [1999/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARLBAUM, Nils Allerum 805 S-260 35 Ödakra / SE | 02 /
JOHANSSON, Björn Langgatan 19 S-263 32 Höganäs / SE | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Thylén, Eva Matilda, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | Thylén, Eva Matilda, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 97909814.2 | 15.10.1997 | [1999/40] | WO1997SE01731 | Priority number, date | SE19960003805 | 15.10.1996 Original published format: SE 9603805 | [1999/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9816339 | Date: | 23.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0946326 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B22F5/00, F16C9/04 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
B22F5/003 (EP,US);
B22F5/00 (KR);
F16C9/045 (EP,US);
B22F2998/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, F16C7/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1999/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG ANEINANDERPASSENDER TEILE | [1999/40] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING MATING PARTS | [1999/40] | French: | PROCEDE DE REALISATION DE PIECES APPARIEES | [1999/40] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 13.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 24.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2003/01] | 02.08.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.08.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4936163 (HOAG PETER Y [US], et al); | [A]DE3904020 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]EP0651166 (SINTERTECH [FR]); | [A]EP0696688 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al); | [AP]US5613182 (LYNN JEAN C [US]) |