EP0931297 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REMOTE POSTAGE METERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E-Stamp Corporation Suite 110, 3050 Post Oak Boulevard Houston, TX 77056-6524 / US | [1999/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARA, Salim, G. Suite 110, 3050 Post Oak Boulevard Houston, TX 77056-6524 / US | [1999/30] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1999/30] | Jackson, Richard Eric Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97909956.1 | 02.10.1997 | [1999/30] | WO1997US17873 | Priority number, date | US19960725119 | 02.10.1996 Original published format: US 725119 | [1999/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9814907 | Date: | 09.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0931297 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
G07B17/00193 (EP,US);
G07B17/0008 (EP,US);
G07B17/00362 (EP,US);
G07B17/00733 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00064 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00096 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00137 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00161 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00201 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/30] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM FRANKIEREN AUF ABSTAND. | [1999/30] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REMOTE POSTAGE METERING | [1999/30] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'AFFRANCHISSMENT A DISTANCE | [1999/30] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 02.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/47] | 08.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5233657 (GUENTHER STEPHAN [DE]) [A] 1-63; | [A]US5319562 (WHITEHOUSE HARRY T [US]) [A] 1-63; | [A]US5539190 (MANDULEY FLAVIO M [US]) [A] 1-63 |