EP0934063 - USE OF ANTIBODIES TO SIALIDASE AS ANTI-INFECTIOUS AGENTS AND ANTI-INFLAMMATORY AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CROSS, Alan S. 6810 Brookville Road Chevy-Chase, MD 20815 / US | For all designated states Stamatos, Nicholas M. 1330 New Hampshire Avenue N.W. Washington, DC 20036 / US | For all designated states Gomatos, Peter J. 2101 South Ocean Lane Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/32] | For all designated states Cross, Alan S. 6810 Brookville Road Chevy-Chase, MD 20815 / US | ||
For all designated states Stamatos, Nicholas M. 1330 New Hampshire Avenue N.W. Washington, DC 20036 / US | |||
For all designated states Gomatos, Peter J. 2101 South Ocean Lane Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/32] | Representative(s) | Williams, Richard Andrew Norman, et al Avidity IP Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Williams, Richard Andrew Norman, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [1999/32] | Bizley, Richard Edward Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97910140.9 | 21.10.1997 | [1999/32] | WO1997US18728 | Priority number, date | US19960736236 | 23.10.1996 Original published format: US 736236 | [1999/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9817272 | Date: | 30.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0934063 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.04.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/70, A61K39/21 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/7012 (EP,US);
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61K31/7004 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1999/32] | A61K31/35, A61K39/21 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, SE [1999/32] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON HYALORUNAN IN GENTHERAPIE | [1999/32] | English: | USE OF ANTIBODIES TO SIALIDASE AS ANTI-INFECTIOUS AGENTS AND ANTI-INFLAMMATORY AGENTS | [1999/32] | French: | UTILISATION D'ANTICORPS CONTRE LA SIALIDASE EN TANT QU'AGENTS ANTI-INFECTIEUX ET ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRES | [1999/32] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.1999 | Search fee paid | 21.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 25.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/50] | 09.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.04.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9520959 (US ARMY [US]) [X] 1-8 * page 7 - page 8 * * page 9, line 20 - line 28 *; | [X]EP0727216 (TAIYO KAGAKU KK [JP]) [X] 1 * tables 2-7 *; | [X]GB2289274 (ERBA CARLO SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1 * page 7, line 11 *; | [X]EP0502827 (NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1 * page 3 *; | [X]US5489675 (SABESAN SUBRAMANIAM [US]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 9 - line 14 *; | [X]JPH01121215 ; | [X] - "sialidase inhibitor comprising at least one of aloe-emodin and sennidin", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, (1989), Database accession no. 182758, XP002153162 & JPH01121215 A 19890512 (NIHON HAIPOKKUSU KK) [X] 1 * abstract * | [XD] - GOROG ET AL, "suppression of the intravascular adherence of granulocytes by N-acetyl neuraminic acid", BRITISH JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL PATHOLOGY, (1980), vol. 61, pages 490 - 495, XP000943385 [XD] 1 * abstract * | [X] - ISHI ET AL, "anti-inflammatory action of N-acetylneuraminic acid in the respiratory tract in rats", JPN J PHARMACOL., (1988), vol. 46, page 137p, XP000943398 [X] 1 * abstract * | International search | [XP]US5631283 (CROSS ALAN S [US], et al) | [YP] - J. VIROL., November 1996, Vol. 70, No. 11, HU H. et al., "Infectivities of Human and Other Primate Lentiviruses are Activated by Desialylation of the Virion Surface", pages 7462-7470. | [Y] - J. CELL. BIOCHEM. SUPPL., 1992, STAMATOS et al., "Desialylation of Peripheral Blood Mononuclear Cells Promotes Growth of HIV-1", page 56, 16 part E, Q348. |