EP0925595 - WHEELED CIRCUIT INTERRUPTER PROVIDED WITH A BLOWER-ATTENUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.06.2001 [2001/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEYLITZ, Erhard Marienburger Strasse 11 D-10405 Berlin / DE | [1999/26] | Application number, filing date | 97910211.8 | 16.09.1997 | [1999/26] | WO1997DE02123 | Priority number, date | DE1996138948 | 16.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19638948 | [1999/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9812721 | Date: | 26.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0925595 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0925595 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/34, H02B11/173 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
H02B11/173 (EP,US);
H01H9/34 (EP,US);
H01H9/342 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1999/26] | Title | German: | FAHRBAR ANGEORDNETER LEISTUNGSSCHALTER MIT EINEM AUSBLASDÄMPFER | [1999/26] | English: | WHEELED CIRCUIT INTERRUPTER PROVIDED WITH A BLOWER-ATTENUATOR | [1999/26] | French: | SECTIONNEUR DE PUISSANCE ROULANT AVEC ATTENUATEUR-SOUFFLEUR | [1999/26] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 21.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE2165942 (SIEMENS AG) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0437151 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 32 - line 57; figures 5-8; claim 8 * |