EP0930934 - PROCESS FOR ENLARGING THE SURFACE OF PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/30] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EYERER, Peter Rieslingstrasse 30 D-76228 Stupferich / DE | 02 /
ELSNER, Peter Amselfeldstrasse 8 D-76327 Pfinztal / DE | 03 /
EMMERICH, Rudolf Näherweg 19 D-76646 Bruchsal / DE | [1999/30] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2001/04] |
Former [1999/30] | Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti Dipl.-Phys. Dr.rer.nat. Jost Lempert Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 97910358.7 | 25.09.1997 | [1999/30] | WO1997EP05263 | Priority number, date | DE19961039491 | 26.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19639491 | [1999/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9813132 | Date: | 02.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0930934 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0930934 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01J2/00, C08J3/12, B01J20/26 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
B01J20/3441 (EP,US);
A61L15/60 (EP,US);
A61L27/50 (EP,US);
B29B13/065 (EP,US);
B29B13/08 (EP,US);
B29B9/16 (EP,US);
D06M10/003 (EP,US);
D06P5/2083 (EP,US);
F26B3/347 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0855 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERGRÖSSERUNG DER OBERFLÄCHE VON PARTIKELN | [1999/30] | English: | PROCESS FOR ENLARGING THE SURFACE OF PARTICLES | [1999/30] | French: | PROCEDE POUR AGRANDIR LA SURFACE DE PARTICULES | [1999/30] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 22.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 30.05.2001 | IE | 30.05.2001 | IT | 30.05.2001 | NL | 30.05.2001 | DK | 30.08.2001 | PT | 30.08.2001 | SE | 30.08.2001 | GR | 31.08.2001 | AT | 25.09.2001 | LU | 25.09.2001 | MC | 25.09.2001 | BE | 30.09.2001 | CH | 30.09.2001 | LI | 30.09.2001 | ES | 30.11.2001 | [2008/07] |
Former [2005/01] | FI | 30.05.2001 | |
IE | 30.05.2001 | ||
NL | 30.05.2001 | ||
DK | 30.08.2001 | ||
PT | 30.08.2001 | ||
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
GR | 31.08.2001 | ||
AT | 25.09.2001 | ||
LU | 25.09.2001 | ||
MC | 25.09.2001 | ||
BE | 30.09.2001 | ||
CH | 30.09.2001 | ||
LI | 30.09.2001 | ||
ES | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 30.05.2001 | |
IE | 30.05.2001 | ||
NL | 30.05.2001 | ||
DK | 30.08.2001 | ||
PT | 30.08.2001 | ||
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
AT | 25.09.2001 | ||
LU | 25.09.2001 | ||
MC | 25.09.2001 | ||
BE | 30.09.2001 | ||
CH | 30.09.2001 | ||
LI | 30.09.2001 | ||
ES | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FI | 30.05.2001 | |
IE | 30.05.2001 | ||
NL | 30.05.2001 | ||
DK | 30.08.2001 | ||
PT | 30.08.2001 | ||
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
AT | 25.09.2001 | ||
MC | 25.09.2001 | ||
BE | 30.09.2001 | ||
CH | 30.09.2001 | ||
LI | 30.09.2001 | ||
ES | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 30.05.2001 | |
IE | 30.05.2001 | ||
NL | 30.05.2001 | ||
DK | 30.08.2001 | ||
PT | 30.08.2001 | ||
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
AT | 25.09.2001 | ||
MC | 25.09.2001 | ||
BE | 30.09.2001 | ||
CH | 30.09.2001 | ||
LI | 30.09.2001 | ||
Former [2003/31] | FI | 30.05.2001 | |
IE | 30.05.2001 | ||
NL | 30.05.2001 | ||
PT | 30.08.2001 | ||
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
AT | 25.09.2001 | ||
MC | 25.09.2001 | ||
BE | 30.09.2001 | ||
CH | 30.09.2001 | ||
LI | 30.09.2001 | ||
Former [2003/06] | FI | 30.05.2001 | |
IE | 30.05.2001 | ||
NL | 30.05.2001 | ||
PT | 30.08.2001 | ||
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
MC | 25.09.2001 | ||
BE | 30.09.2001 | ||
CH | 30.09.2001 | ||
LI | 30.09.2001 | ||
Former [2003/01] | FI | 30.05.2001 | |
IE | 30.05.2001 | ||
PT | 30.08.2001 | ||
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
MC | 25.09.2001 | ||
CH | 30.09.2001 | ||
LI | 30.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 30.05.2001 | |
IE | 30.05.2001 | ||
PT | 30.08.2001 | ||
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
MC | 25.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/43] | FI | 30.05.2001 | |
PT | 30.08.2001 | ||
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
MC | 25.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | FI | 30.05.2001 | |
PT | 30.08.2001 | ||
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | FI | 30.05.2001 | |
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 30.08.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5635928B ; | [Y]DE2327956 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH) [Y] 1-4 * page 4; claims 1-6 *; | [Y]EP0085014 (BENDIX CORP [US]) [Y] 5 * page 1 - page 4; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4513513 (SAYLES DAVID C [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP0514775 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0695763 (AMCOL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [Y] 1-5 * column 1, line 5 - line 20 * * column 2, line 16 - line 21 * * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 13; claims 1-30 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 81, no. 38, Database accession no. 81-69134D, XP002055124 & JPS5635928B B2 19810820 (TOA YAKUHIN KOGYO KK) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |