EP1007137 - Safety monitoring apparatus for a patient care system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/24] | SAFETY MONITORING APPARATUS FOR A PATIENT CARE SYSTEM | ||
[2005/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cardinal Health 303, Inc. 10221 Wateridge Circle San Diego CA 92121 / US | [2006/01] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states ALARIS Medical Systems, Inc. 10221 Wateridge Circle, Building A San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states ALARIS Medical, Inc. 10221 Wateridge Circle, Building A San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states ALARIS Medical Systems, Inc. 10221 Wateridge Circle San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states IMED CORPORATION 9775 Businesspark Avenue San Diego, CA 92131-1699 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUFFY, Robert, J. 16405 Summer Sage Road Poway, CA 92064 / US | 02 /
SEVERE, Lon, M. 5655 Guincho Court San Diego, CA 92124 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Naismith, Robert Stewart, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Naismith, Robert Stewart, et al CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 97910767.9 | 03.10.1997 | [2000/24] | WO1997US17793 | Priority number, date | US19960726882 | 04.10.1996 Original published format: US 726882 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9814234 | Date: | 09.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1007137 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1007137 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/168, A61M5/172 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
A61M5/142 (EP,US);
G16H40/40 (EP,US);
A61M2205/17 (EP,US);
A61M2205/581 (EP,US);
A61M2205/583 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/24] | A61M31/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2000/24] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsüberwachungseinrichtung für ein Patientenbehandlungssystem | [2005/25] | English: | Safety monitoring apparatus for a patient care system | [2005/25] | French: | Dispositif pour le contrôle de sécurité dans un systeme de soins aux patients | [2005/25] |
Former [2000/24] | SICHERHEITSÜBERWACHUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN PATIENTENBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2000/24] | SAFETY MONITORING APPARATUS FOR A PATIENT CARE SYSTEM | ||
Former [2000/24] | DISPOSITIF POUR LE CONTROLE DE SECURITE DANS UN SYSTEME DE SOINS AUX PATIENTS | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.1999 | Search fee paid | 12.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.04.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 21.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9620745 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [X] 1-25 * page 7, line 9 - line 19; figure 1 *; | [X]WO9408647 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * page 8, line 17 - line 23; figure 2 *; | [X]US5472614 (ROSSI ANDREA [IT]) [X] 1,6,9,17,20-22 * column W *; | [X]WO9625214 (AKSYS LTD [US], et al) [X] 1,6,9,17,20-22 * page 72, line 7 - page 73, line 13; figure 16 *; | [A]EP0384155 (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-25 * column W *; | [A]EP0192786 (MEDRAD INC [US]) [A] 1-25 * page 10, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [PX]US5630710 (TUNE JOEL [US], et al) [PX] 1-25 * column W * | International search | [X]US5304127 (KAWAHARA MASAFUMI [US], et al) | by applicant | US4756706 | US4898578 | US5256157 | US5100380 | US5165873 |