EP0930901 - GASKETLESS SEAL FOR ROTATABLE BLOOD RESERVOIR CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 7000 Central Avenue N.E. Minneapolis MN 55432-3576 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/30] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 7000 Central Avenue N.E. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DRIEL, Michael, R. 10070 Quail Court Fountain Valley, CA 92708 / US | [1999/30] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/30] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97910781.0 | 02.10.1997 | [1999/30] | WO1997US17866 | Priority number, date | US19960728873 | 10.10.1996 Original published format: US 728873 | [1999/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9815304 | Date: | 16.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0930901 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0930901 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/36, A61M39/10 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
A61M39/1055 (EP,US);
A61M1/3627 (EP,US);
A61M1/3632 (EP,US);
A61M2039/1027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [1999/30] | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSLOSE ABDICHTUNG FÜR EINEN DREHBAREN KONNEKTOR EINES BLUTRESERVOIRS | [1999/30] | English: | GASKETLESS SEAL FOR ROTATABLE BLOOD RESERVOIR CONNECTOR | [1999/30] | French: | FERMETURE SANS JOINT D'ETANCHEITE POUR UN CONNECTEUR DE RESERVOIR DE SANG ROTATIF | [1999/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 05.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 15.01.2003 | [2008/07] | Cited in | International search | [A]US5403273 (LINDSAY ERIN J [US]) [A] 1* column 5, line 44 - line 63 *; | [X]US5470324 (COOK CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 9, paragraph 2; figures 15-18 * |