EP0934382 - THE USE OF POLYCATIONIC CONDENSATION PRODUCTS AS AN ADDITIVE FOR DETERGENTS OR DETERGENT AFTER TREATMENT AGENTS IN ORDER TO INHIBIT RUNNING OF COLOURS AND TO REDUCE COLOUR LOSS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1999/32] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOECKH, Dieter Zeppelinstrasse 3 D-67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 02 /
JÄGER, Hans-Ulrich Erschigweg 31 D-67434 Neustadt / DE | 03 /
LUX, Jürgen, Alfred Rohrweiherweg 10 D-67150 Niederkirchen / DE | [1999/32] | Application number, filing date | 97911213.3 | 10.10.1997 | [1999/32] | WO1997EP05606 | Priority number, date | DE1996143281 | 21.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19643281 | [1999/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9817762 | Date: | 30.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0934382 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0934382 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/00, C11D3/37 | [1999/32] | CPC: |
C11D3/0021 (EP,US);
C11D3/37 (US);
C11D3/3723 (EP,US);
C11D3/3776 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/32] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON POLYKATIONISCHEN KONDENSATIONSPRODUKTEN ALS FARBÜBERTRAGUNGSINHIBIERENDEN UND FARBABLÖSUNGSVERMINDERNDEN ZUSATZ ZU WASCHMITTELN UND WÄSCHENACHBEHANDLUNGSMITTELN | [1999/32] | English: | THE USE OF POLYCATIONIC CONDENSATION PRODUCTS AS AN ADDITIVE FOR DETERGENTS OR DETERGENT AFTER TREATMENT AGENTS IN ORDER TO INHIBIT RUNNING OF COLOURS AND TO REDUCE COLOUR LOSS | [1999/32] | French: | UTILISATION DE PRODUITS DE CONDENSATION POLYCATIONIQUES COMME ADJUVANTS INHIBITEURS DE TRANSFERT DE COULEURS ET REDUCTEURS DE DECOLORATION POUR LES LESSIVES ET PRODUITS DE POSTLAVAGE | [1999/32] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 27.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 18.12.2002 | GR | 18.12.2002 | IE | 18.12.2002 | NL | 18.12.2002 | DK | 18.03.2003 | PT | 18.03.2003 | SE | 18.03.2003 | [2004/02] |
Former [2003/43] | FI | 18.12.2002 | |
GR | 18.12.2002 | ||
IE | 18.12.2002 | ||
NL | 18.12.2002 | ||
PT | 18.03.2003 | ||
SE | 18.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/42] | GR | 18.12.2002 | |
IE | 18.12.2002 | ||
NL | 18.12.2002 | ||
SE | 18.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 18.12.2002 | |
NL | 18.12.2002 | ||
SE | 18.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 18.12.2002 | |
SE | 18.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 18.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3545990 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] * claims 1-13 * | Examination | EP0209787 |