EP0936881 - SYSTEM FOR KEEPING STOCKINGS OR TIGHTS IN PLACE BY RESTING THEM ON THE HIPS, AND THE TIGHTS MANUFACTURED ACCORDINGLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conti, Giuseppe Via Maragliano, 137 50144 Firenze / IT | For all designated states Bruscoli, Maria Assunta Via Imprunetana per Pozzonatico, 170 50023 Impruneta / IT | [1999/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Turini, Laura Studio Legale Turini Via Lamarmora 55 50121 Florence (FI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | Turini, Laura Studio Legale Avv. Laura Turini, Via Castello 50 56030 S. Pietro Belvedere (PI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 97911434.5 | 24.10.1997 | [1999/34] | WO1997IT00263 | Priority number, date | IT1996PI00035U | 05.11.1996 Original published format: IT PI960035 U | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9819566 | Date: | 14.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0936881 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0936881 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A41B11/14 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
A41B11/143 (EP,US);
A41B11/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/34] | Title | German: | MITTEL ZUR HALTUNG VON STRÜMPFEN ODER STRÜMPFHOSEN AN HÜFTEN UND SO HERGESTELLTE STRÜMPFHOSEN | [1999/34] | English: | SYSTEM FOR KEEPING STOCKINGS OR TIGHTS IN PLACE BY RESTING THEM ON THE HIPS, AND THE TIGHTS MANUFACTURED ACCORDINGLY | [1999/34] | French: | SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE MAINTENIR EN PLACE DES BAS OU DES COLLANTS EN LES FAISANT REPOSER SUR LES HANCHES, ET COLLANTS FABRIQUES D'APRES CE SYSTEME | [1999/34] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 07.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.02.2002 | CH | 20.02.2002 | FI | 20.02.2002 | LI | 20.02.2002 | NL | 20.02.2002 | DK | 20.05.2002 | ES | 29.08.2002 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/46] | BE | 20.02.2002 | |
CH | 20.02.2002 | ||
FI | 20.02.2002 | ||
LI | 20.02.2002 | ||
NL | 20.02.2002 | ||
DK | 20.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 20.02.2002 | |
CH | 20.02.2002 | ||
FI | 20.02.2002 | ||
LI | 20.02.2002 | ||
NL | 20.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 20.02.2002 | |
FI | 20.02.2002 | ||
LI | 20.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 20.02.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3487473 (JANHSEN JACOBUS) [X] 1,2,4,10-12 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 33; figures 1-9; claims 1,6 *; | [X]US3547128 (KELTNER RAYMOND O) [X] 1-4,7-9,11,12 * column 1, line 66 - column 3, line 30 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 16; figures 1-8 *; | [X]GB1217220 (RIDLEY SPRIGGS & JOHNSON) [X] 1,2,4,7-9,11,12 * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 11; figures 1-7 *; | [X]US4019208 (WALSER JR JOSEPH G, et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,11,12 * column 2, line 28 - column 4, line 6; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US5014364 (ORR DONNA R [US]) [X] 1,4,7,10-12 * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 15 ** column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 7; figures 1-3 * |