EP0936927 - SCANNING DEVICE FOR EVALUATING CLEANLINESS AND INTEGRITY OF MEDICAL AND DENTAL INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.01.2000 [2000/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STERIS CORPORATION 5960 Heisley Road Mentor Ohio 44060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states STERIS CORPORATION 5960 Heisley Road Mentor, Ohio 44060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALCHESKY, Paul, S. 239 Barrington Ridge Painesville Township, OH 44077 / US | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Gasquet, Denis Cabinet Gasquet Route de la Bouvarde Park Nord Les Pléiades 24 D 74370 Epagny Metz-Tessy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | Gasquet, Denis CABINET GASQUET, Les Pléiades n 24C Park Nord-Annecy 74370 Metz Tessy / FR | Application number, filing date | 97911735.5 | 16.10.1997 | [1999/34] | WO1997US18610 | Priority number, date | US19960732038 | 16.10.1996 Original published format: US 732038 | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9816260 | Date: | 23.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0936927 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/26, G01N21/35, G01N21/88 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
G01N21/35 (EP,US);
A61L2/28 (EP,US);
G01N21/3577 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/34] | Title | German: | ABTASTVORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER SAUBERKEIT UND REINHEIT VON MEDIZINISCHEN UND ZAHNMEDIZINISCHEN INSTRUMENTEN | [1999/34] | English: | SCANNING DEVICE FOR EVALUATING CLEANLINESS AND INTEGRITY OF MEDICAL AND DENTAL INSTRUMENTS | [1999/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BALAYAGE UTILISE POUR EVALUER LA PROPRETE ET LE BON ETAT D'INSTRUMENTS MEDICAUX ET DENTAIRES | [1999/34] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 18.11.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0644412 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,7-10 * column 2, line 12 - line 58 * * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 11 * * column 9, line 20 - line 53 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,5,6; | [YA]US3747755 (SENTURIA S, et al) [Y] 3 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 1 * * claim - * [A] 1,4,7-9; | [Y]GB2173300 (SCHAUDT MASCHINENBAU GMBH) [Y] 5,6 * page 1, line 123 - page 2, line 46 * * page 3, line 121 - page 4, line 3 * * figure 3 *; | [PX]WO9732195 (FOSTER MILLER INC [US]) [PX] 1-5,7-10 * page 1, line 10 - line 26 * * page 6, line 9 - line 22 * * figure 2 * |