EP0956207 - VENT SYSTEM FOR WRITING INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berol Corporation 29 E. Stephenson Street Freeport, IL 61032 / US | [2001/24] |
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states THE GILETTE COMPANY Prudential Tower Building Boston, MA 02199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERT, Beth 17 Tinkham Lane Mattapoisett, MA 02739 / US | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/46] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97911908.8 | 27.10.1997 | [1999/46] | WO1997US19233 | Priority number, date | US19960756396 | 27.11.1996 Original published format: US 756396 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9823451 | Date: | 04.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956207 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0956207 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B43K23/12, B43K29/02 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
B43K23/124 (EP,US);
B43K29/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/46] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUM ENTLÜFTEN FÜR SCHREIBGERÄT | [1999/46] | English: | VENT SYSTEM FOR WRITING INSTRUMENT | [1999/46] | French: | SYSTEME D'EVENT POUR INSTRUMENTS D'ECRITURE | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 20.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 26.09.2001 | DE | 28.12.2001 | ES | 26.03.2002 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/04] | DE | 28.12.2001 | |
ES | 26.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | DE | 28.12.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5221152 (CHUANG CHENG-HWA [TW]) [A] 1,2,4,5,11,12,16,19,20 * column 4, line 30 - line 41; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US3917416 (STEYER ANN) [A] 16,17 * column 3, paragraph 2; figure 6 *; | [AP]JPH0966697 ; | [AP]JPH08332798 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 097, no. 007, & JP09066697 A 19970311 (PENTEL KK) [AP] 1,2,16 * abstract * | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 097, no. 004, & JP08332798 A 19961217 (ZEBRA PEN CORP) [AP] 16,17 * abstract * |