EP0883748 - JET PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1998/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIEDER, Dietmar Wiesenweg 60 D-71696 Möglingen / DE | 02 /
STROHL, Willi Rieslingstrasse 13 D-71717 Beilstein / DE | 03 /
ROSE, Jochen Muenchinger Strasse 10 D-71282 Hemmingen / DE | 04 /
EILER, Erich Eberhardstrasse 1 D-74372 Sersheim / DE | [1998/51] | Application number, filing date | 97912050.8 | 15.10.1997 | [1998/51] | WO1997DE02355 | Priority number, date | DE1996151650 | 12.12.1996 Original published format: DE 19651650 | [1998/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9826184 | Date: | 18.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0883748 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F04D5/00, F02M37/04 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
F02M37/048 (EP,US);
F04D5/00 (KR);
F04D5/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1998/51] | Title | German: | STRÖMUNGSPUMPE | [1998/51] | English: | JET PUMP | [1998/51] | French: | POMPE A JET | [1998/51] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/08] | 11.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/46] | 10.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3259072 (CARPENTER KEITH H) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2741535 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1,4-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0283780 (COLT IND INC [US]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3925396 (SWF AUTO ELECTRIC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4-6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1453774 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]US4649884 (TUCKEY CHARLES H [US]) | by applicant | US4649884 | DE4020521 |