EP0930869 - DEODORIZING PREPARATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2002/14] |
Former [1999/44] | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1999/30] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WACHTER, Rolf Clausthal-Zellerfelder-Strasse 48 D-40595 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
TESMANN, Holger Unter den Linden 23 D-41363 Jüchen / DE | 03 /
BEHLER, Ansgar Siegfriedstrasse 80 D-46240 Bottrop / DE | 04 /
MAURER, Karl-Heinz Dechenstrasse 5 D-40699 Erkrath / DE | [1999/30] | Application number, filing date | 97912138.1 | 08.10.1997 | [1999/30] | WO1997EP05523 | Priority number, date | DE1996142874 | 17.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19642874 | [1999/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9817241 | Date: | 30.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0930869 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0930869 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/38, A61K7/32 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
A61Q15/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/26 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/63 (EP,US);
A61K8/736 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61K2800/782 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [1999/30] | Title | German: | DESODORIERENDE ZUBEREITUNGEN | [1999/30] | English: | DEODORIZING PREPARATIONS | [1999/30] | French: | PREPARATIONS DESODORISANTES | [1999/30] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 19.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2029441 (TOYO AEROSOL IND CO) [X] 1,6 * claims 1,11,12 * * page 1, lines 46-53 *; | [X]FR2597367 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1,2,6 * claims 1,2,9,11,12 * * page 10, line 9 - page 11, line 11 ** page 16, lines 7-16 *; | [X]DE4107712 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,3,6 * claim 1 * * page 3, lines 3-23 * |