EP0934031 - PROCESS FOR OPERATING A BLOOD CENTRIFUGATION UNIT, AND CENTRIFUGATION UNIT FOR CARRYING OUT THE PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biotest Medizintechnik GmbH Industriestrasse 19 63755 Alzenau / DE | [2004/10] |
Former [1999/32] | For all designated states Geigle, Peter In den Mühlgärten 42 63755 Alzenau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/32] | Representative(s) | Preissner, Nicolaus, et al Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Preissner, Nicolaus, et al Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/10] | Preissner, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Flügel Preissner Kastel Postfach 44 03 62 80752 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/32] | Grimm, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Phys. Edith-Stein-Strasse 22 63075 Offenbach/Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 97912216.5 | 24.10.1997 | [1999/32] | WO1997EP05865 | Priority number, date | DE1996144336 | 25.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19644336 | [1999/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9818403 | Date: | 07.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0934031 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0934031 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/36 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
B04B5/0442 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0815 (EP,US);
B04B2005/0464 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/32] | A61F2/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER BLUT-ZENTRIFUGIEREINHEIT, SOWIE ZENTRIFUGIEREINHEIT ZUM DURCHFÜHREN EINES SOLCHEN VERFAHRENS | [1999/32] | English: | PROCESS FOR OPERATING A BLOOD CENTRIFUGATION UNIT, AND CENTRIFUGATION UNIT FOR CARRYING OUT THE PROCESS | [1999/32] | French: | PROCEDE D'EXPLOITATION D'UNE UNITE DE CENTRIFUGATION DU SANG, ET UNITE DE CENTRIFUGATION DU SANG POUR METTRE EN OEUVRE CE PROCEDE | [1999/32] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 25.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4227695 (FRESENIUS AG [DE]) [A] 1,8 * column 3, paragraph 2; figure 2 *; | [A]WO9405349 (HAEMONETICS CORP [US]) [A] 1,8* abstract *; | [A]EP0664160 (COBE LAB [US]) [A] 1,8 * abstract * | Examination | EP0664160 | by applicant | US3145713 | DE2745041 | EP0014093 | EP0015288 | US4859333 | US4879031 | US5514070 |