EP0951335 - AIR FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mcleod Russel Holdings PLC Suite Two Hitching Court, Blacklands Way, Abingdon Business Park Abingdon Oxon OX14 1RG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/43] | For all designated states Mcleod Russel Holdings PLC Suite Two Hitching Court, Blacklands Way, Abingdon Business Park Abingdon, Oxon OX14 1RG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÖHE, Werner Essener Strasse 4 D-41564 Kaarst / DE | 02 /
SCHULZ, Rainer Am Blumenhaus 76 D-45549 Sprockhövel / DE | [1999/43] | Representative(s) | Shaw, Laurence 5th Floor, Metropolitan House, 1 Hagley Road, Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8TG / GB | [1999/43] | Application number, filing date | 97912304.9 | 14.11.1997 | [1999/43] | WO1997GB03043 | Priority number, date | DE1996147074 | 14.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19647074 | DE1996147043 | 14.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19647043 | [1999/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9820961 | Date: | 22.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0951335 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0951335 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/52 | [1999/43] | CPC: |
B01D46/10 (EP);
B01D46/0005 (EP);
B01D46/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTFILTER | [1999/43] | English: | AIR FILTER | [1999/43] | French: | FILTRATION D'AIR | [1999/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/43] | 20.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18] | Request for further processing for: | 05.08.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 05.08.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.08.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 07.05.2003 | [2006/32] | Cited in | International search | [A]US3620375 (ATKINS JACK) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5273564 (HILL CHARLES W [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 26 - line 64; figures 1-4 *; | [A]GB1594700 (MARSHALL D A G) [A] 3 * figures 1,3 *; | [A]US4963171 (OSENDORF RICHARD J [US]) [A] 1-4 * column 4, line 19 - line 34; figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE2739815 (CEAG FILTER ENTSTAUBUNG) [A] 10-19 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1239451 (FR DE L ACETYLENE SOC) [A] 8,10,11,13-17 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0726389 (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 28 - line 40; figure 2 * |