EP0888780 - TREATMENT COMPOSITION FOR CONTACT LENSES AND METHOD FOR TREATING CONTACT LENSES WITH THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Menicon Co., Ltd. 21-19, Aoi 3-chome, Naka-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 460-0006 / JP | [2005/52] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states TOMEY TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 11-33 Noritakeshin-machi 2-chome, Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 451 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAGAWA, Akira, Tomey Technology Corporation 11-33, Noritakeshinmachi 2-chome, Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 451 / JP | 02 /
NIWA, Yoshiko, Tomey Technology Corporation 11-33, Noritakeshinmachi 2-chome, Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 451 / JP | 03 /
KOZAWA, Takako, Tomey Technology Corporation 11-33, Noritakeshinmachi 2-chome, Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 451 / JP | 04 /
TSUBOI, Keiko, Tomey Technology Corporation 11-33, Noritakeshinmachi 2-chome, Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 451 / JP | 05 /
YOSHIHARA, Kyoko, Tomey Technology Corporation 11-33, Noritakeshinmachi 2-chome, Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 451 / JP | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 97912423.7 | 12.11.1997 | [1999/01] | WO1997JP04108 | Priority number, date | JP19960301639 | 13.11.1996 Original published format: JP 30163996 | JP19970209345 | 04.08.1997 Original published format: JP 20934597 | [1999/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9820912 | Date: | 22.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0888780 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0888780 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0888780 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.05.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/18 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
C11D3/48 (EP);
A61L12/04 (EP);
A61L12/08 (EP);
A61L12/082 (EP);
C11D3/0078 (EP);
C11D3/30 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1999/01] | A61L2/18, G02C13/00, C11D7/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/01] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KONTAKTLINSEN UND METHODE ZUR ANWENDUNG DERSELBEN | [1999/01] | English: | TREATMENT COMPOSITION FOR CONTACT LENSES AND METHOD FOR TREATING CONTACT LENSES WITH THE SAME | [1999/01] | French: | COMPOSITION DE TRAITEMENT POUR LENTILLES DE CONTACT ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE LENTILLES DE CONTACT AU MOYEN DE LADITE COMPOSITION | [1999/01] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.1998 | Translation filed | 03.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.1998 | Search fee paid | 03.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 14.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.07.2004
09.08.2004
ADMISSIBLE Hödl Joseph Drei Raine 1 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE Opponent's representative Best, Michael Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.07.2004
Hödl Joseph Drei Raine 1 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE Opponent's representative Best, Michael, Dr. Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | 12.08.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.12.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.01.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.02.2006 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.02.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.01.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.07.2009 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 09.03.2006 | Appeal received No. T0368/06 | 16.06.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.01.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 27.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.02.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0001888 (FISONS) [A] 1 * page 7, line 1 - line 8 * | International search | [A]JPH0829744 ; | [A]JPH07146454 ; | [A]JPH08271841 | Opposition | US5422073 | WO9602624 | US4581332 |