EP0935579 - SPOOL MADE OF PLASTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Höglind, Inga-Lill Lergarden 330 15 Bor / SE | For all designated states Svensson, Ingvar Ture Sällbergsgatan 14 B 331 32 Värnamo / SE | [2001/18] |
Former [1999/33] | For all designated states Flaren AB Box 2004 441 02 Varnamo / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/18] |
Former [1999/33] | 01 /
HÖGLIND, Inga-Lill Lergarden S-330 15 Bor / SE | ||
02 /
SVENSSON, Ingvar Ture Sällbergsg 14b S-331 32 Värnamo / SE | Representative(s) | Lindberg, Klas Valter Bo, et al AWAPATENT AB, Södra Hamngatan 37-41, P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Lindberg, Klas Valter Bo, et al AWAPATENT AB, Södra Hamngatan 37-41, P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [1999/33] | Lindberg, Klas Valter Bo, et al Awapatent AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 97912604.2 | 04.11.1997 | [1999/33] | WO1997SE01834 | Priority number, date | SE19960004038 | 04.11.1996 Original published format: SE 9604038 | [1999/33] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9819953 | Date: | 14.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0935579 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0935579 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65H75/22 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
B65H75/2245 (EP,US);
B65H75/2281 (EP,US);
B65H2701/5136 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FI, GB, LI, SE [1999/33] | Title | German: | AUS KUNSTSTOFF HERGESTELLTE SPULE | [1999/33] | English: | SPOOL MADE OF PLASTICS | [1999/33] | French: | BOBINE EN PLASTIQUE | [1999/33] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.1998 | Translation filed | 03.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 03.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/33] | 29.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 21.05.2003 | FI | 21.05.2003 | LI | 21.05.2003 | DK | 21.08.2003 | SE | 21.08.2003 | GB | 04.11.2003 | [2004/45] |
Former [2004/23] | CH | 21.05.2003 | |
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
DK | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | CH | 21.05.2003 | |
FI | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 21.05.2003 | |
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 21.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2990133 (TUCKER JR GEORGE G); | [X]DE2259364 (FILTHAUT FA FRANZ [DE]); | [A]EP0214562 (HAFNER & KRULLMANN GMBH); | [A]SE469982 (ULVATOR AB [SE]); | [A]DE4414577 (IN AKUSTIK GMBH UNTERHALTUNGSE [DE]) |