EP0937021 - PRODUCTION OF NABUMETONE OR PRECURSORS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2001 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALBEMARLE CORPORATION 451 Florida Street Baton Rouge, LA 70801-1765 / US | [1999/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECNEL, Brian, F. 2365 Oak Alley Port Allen, LA 70767 / US | 02 /
SABAHI, Mahmood 851 Shadow Oak Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70810 / US | 03 /
THERIOT, Kevin, J. 7565 Sheringham Avenue Baton Rouge, LA 70808 / US | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97912808.9 | 21.10.1997 | [1999/34] | WO1997US18936 | Priority number, date | US19960731806 | 21.10.1996 Original published format: US 731806 | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9817616 | Date: | 30.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0937021 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07C41/16, C07C37/00, C07C43/225, C07C39/38, C07C49/255, C07C47/575 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
C07C37/00 (EP,US);
C07C41/16 (EP,US);
C07C41/34 (EP,US);
C07C41/40 (EP,US);
C07C41/42 (EP,US);
C07C45/004 (EP,US);
C07C45/512 (EP,US);
C07C45/62 (EP,US);
C07C45/68 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C37/00, C07C39/38 (EP,US);
C07C41/16, C07C43/225 (EP,US);
C07C41/34, C07C43/225 (EP,US);
C07C41/40, C07C43/225 (EP);
C07C41/42, C07C43/225 (EP);
C07C41/42, C07C43/225, C07C41/40, C07C43/225 (US);
C07C45/004, C07C47/575 (US,EP);
C07C45/512, C07C49/255 (US);
C07C45/512, C07C49/255, C07C45/62, C07C49/255 (EP);
C07C45/62, C07C49/255 (US); | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/34] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON NABUMETON ODER SEINEN VORLÄUFERN | [1999/34] | English: | PRODUCTION OF NABUMETONE OR PRECURSORS THEREOF | [1999/34] | French: | PRODUCTION DE NABUMETONES OU DE SES PRECURSEURS | [1999/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 26.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/41] | 18.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE2338811 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [Y] 1-5,8,25,26,30-33,37 * the whole document *; | [DAX]US5256829 (JACQUOT ROLAND [FR]) [DA] 1-79,81,82 * the whole document * [X] 80; | [DAX]US4420639 (LAKE ANTHONY W [GB], et al) [DA] 1-39,41-55,58-79 * the whole document * [X] 80-82 | [Y] - J. B. SUMMERS ET AL, "Hydroxamic acid inhibitors of 5-lipoxygenase", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON US, (198703), vol. 30, no. 3, pages 574 - 580, XP002055615 [Y] 1-5,8,25,26,30-33,37 * see page 579, preparation of compounds (35) and (31)-(34), (36) and (37) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00386a022 | [A] - MAN SHING WONG, "Synthesis of novel non-centrosymmetric crystalline materials for quadratic non-linear optics", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, LETCHWORTH GB, (1994), no. 3, pages 249 - 250, XP002055616 [A] * page 250, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c39940000249 |