EP0938283 - DENTAL COMPOSITION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENTSPLY International Inc. 570 West College Avenue P.O. Box 872 York, PA 17405-0872 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states DENTSPLY INTERNATIONAL, INC. 570 West College Avenue, P.O. Box 872 York, PA 17405-0872 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Kewang 696 Independence Boulevard Dover, DE 19901 / US | 02 /
HAMMESFAHR, Paul, D. 605 Quail Run Wyoming, DE 19934 / US | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | Hartz, Nikolai F., Dr., et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz, Patentanwälte, Tal 29 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97912821.2 | 21.10.1997 | [1999/35] | WO1997US18966 | Priority number, date | US19960742019 | 01.11.1996 Original published format: US 742019 | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9819650 | Date: | 14.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0938283 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0938283 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/083 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
A61K6/20 (EP,US);
A61K6/889 (EP,US);
A61K6/30 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/20, C08L33/00 (US,EP);
A61K6/30, C08L33/00 (US,EP);
A61K6/889, C08L33/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/35] | Title | German: | ZAHNÄRZTLICHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [1999/35] | English: | DENTAL COMPOSITION SYSTEM AND METHOD | [1999/35] | French: | FORMULE ET PROCEDE POUR COMPOSITION DENTAIRE | [1999/35] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 14.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 05.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0325266 (ESPE STIFTUNG [DE]) [Y] 10,11,33,34 * page 3, line 15 - line 21 *; | [XY]US5154762 (MITRA SUMITA B [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9 * column 2, line 5 - line 52 * * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 16 * * column 4, line 54 - column 6, line 12 * [Y] 7,8,10,11,22-32,35,42-50; | [A]US5204383 (MANABE ATSUFUMI [US], et al) [A] 1* column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 41 *; | [Y]EP0554890 (DENTSPLY INT INC [US]) [Y] 7,8,43,44 * page 4, line 54 - page 5, line 32 *; | [YD]US5338773 (LU KEWANG [US], et al) [YD] 22-35,42,44-50 * column 7, line 47 - column 8, line 31 * * column 11, line 33 - column 13, line 13 * * examples 7-9; table 2 *; | [XPY]WO9729732 (DENTSPLY INT INC [US]) [XP] 1-6,9 * examples 1-11,32-39; table - * [Y] 7,8,10,11,22-35,42-50 |