EP0891450 - RAISED PAVEMENT MARKER THAT USES PRESSURE SENSITIVE ADHESIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHIEU, Sithya, S. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
MIRON, Gary, R. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
THAKKAR, Bimal, V. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1999/03] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/03] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97912905.3 | 24.10.1997 | [1999/03] | WO1997US19267 | Priority number, date | US19960760356 | 04.12.1996 Original published format: US 760356 | US19970881652 | 24.06.1997 Original published format: US 881652 | [1999/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9824978 | Date: | 11.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0891450 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0891450 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E01F9/04 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
C09J4/00 (EP,US);
E01F9/512 (EP,US);
E01F9/553 (EP,US);
E01F9/573 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2891 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09J4/00, C08F220/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/03] | Title | German: | ERHÖHTE STRASSENBELAGSMARKIERUNG, DIE HAFTKLEBSTOFF VERWENDET | [2006/39] | English: | RAISED PAVEMENT MARKER THAT USES PRESSURE SENSITIVE ADHESIVE | [1999/03] | French: | MARQUAGE DE REVETEMENT DE LA CHAUSSEE PROFILE UTILISANT UN ADHESIF SENSIBLE A LA PRESSION | [2006/39] |
Former [1999/03] | ERHÖHTE PFLASTER-MARKIERUNG DIE DRUCKSENSIBELES KLEBEMITTEL VERWENDET | ||
Former [1999/03] | PLOT REFLECTORISE UTILISANT UN ADHESIF AUTOCOLLANT | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 29.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Request for further processing for: | 07.01.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 07.01.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.10.1998 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1998 | 15.10.1998 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1998 | 15.10.1998 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1998 | 15.10.1998 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 04.10.2006 | [2008/07] | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9215756 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1 * claims 1,9,10,13 *; | [Y]EP0125785 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 1 * column 6, line 15 *; | [X]EP0279204 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1 * claims 1,9,10 *; | [A]US5374465 (FULCOMER ROBERT D [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 48; claim 13 *; | [PYD]US5667335 (KHIEU SITHYA S [US], et al) [PYD] 1 * claims 1-17 * |