EP0941457 - SENSOR FOR MEASURING ACCELERATION AND SOUND PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VTT Vuorimiehentie 5 02150 Espoo / FI | [1999/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRJAVAINEN, Kari Kivenlahdenkatu 11 A FIN-02320 Espoo / FI | 02 /
LEKKALA, Jukka Liinaharjankatu 10 FIN-33730 Tampere / FI | 03 /
NYKÄNEN, Hannu Timpurinkatu 3 FIN-33720 Tampere / FI | 04 /
UOSUKAINEN, Seppo Lehmustie 1 B FIN-00780 Helsinki / FI | [1999/37] | Representative(s) | Huhtanen, Ossi Jaakko, et al Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | Huhtanen, Ossi Jaakko, et al Kolster Oy AB, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 97913206.5 | 19.11.1997 | [1999/37] | WO1997FI00706 | Priority number, date | FI19960004637 | 20.11.1996 Original published format: FI 964637 | [1999/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9822785 | Date: | 28.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0941457 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0941457 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01H1/06 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
G01P15/125 (EP,US);
G01H11/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/37] | Title | German: | BESCHLEUNIGUNGS -UND SCHALLDRUCKFÜHLER | [1999/37] | English: | SENSOR FOR MEASURING ACCELERATION AND SOUND PRESSURE | [1999/37] | French: | CAPTEUR PERMETTANT DE MESURER L'ACCELERATION AINSI QUE LA PRESSION SONIQUE | [1999/37] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 28.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/37] | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.10.2002 | BE | 16.10.2002 | CH | 16.10.2002 | FI | 16.10.2002 | GR | 16.10.2002 | LI | 16.10.2002 | NL | 16.10.2002 | IE | 19.11.2002 | LU | 19.11.2002 | DK | 16.01.2003 | PT | 16.01.2003 | SE | 16.01.2003 | ES | 29.04.2003 | MC | 01.06.2003 | [2007/17] |
Former [2006/44] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
BE | 16.10.2002 | ||
CH | 16.10.2002 | ||
FI | 16.10.2002 | ||
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
LI | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
IE | 19.11.2002 | ||
LU | 19.11.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
MC | 01.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
BE | 16.10.2002 | ||
CH | 16.10.2002 | ||
FI | 16.10.2002 | ||
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
LI | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
IE | 19.11.2002 | ||
LU | 19.11.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
BE | 16.10.2002 | ||
CH | 16.10.2002 | ||
FI | 16.10.2002 | ||
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
LI | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
IE | 19.11.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
BE | 16.10.2002 | ||
CH | 16.10.2002 | ||
FI | 16.10.2002 | ||
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
LI | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
IE | 19.11.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
BE | 16.10.2002 | ||
CH | 16.10.2002 | ||
FI | 16.10.2002 | ||
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
LI | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
CH | 16.10.2002 | ||
FI | 16.10.2002 | ||
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
LI | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
CH | 16.10.2002 | ||
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
LI | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 16.10.2002 | |
NL | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 16.10.2002 | |
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 16.01.2003 | |
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 16.01.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]SU1808024 ; | [A]JP08184608 ; | [A]US4654546 (KIRJAVAINEN KARI [FI]); | [A]GB2235533 (STC PLC [GB]); | [A]US5325437 (DOI KAZUHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]DE4342169 (SENNHEISER ELECTRONIC [DE]); | [A]US5434371 (BROOKS LAMAR E [US]); | [A]DE4410794 (ADS MESTECHNIK GMBH [DE]); | [A]US5519637 (MATHUR GOPAL [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 96, No. 7; & JP,A,08 184 608 (NIPPONDENSO CO LTD), 16 July 1996., & JP08184608 A 19960716 |