EP0944624 - INSOLUBLE S-TRIAZINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS UV FILTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHARD, Hervé 31, rue Robert Schumann F-93420 Villepinte / FR | 02 /
LEDUC, Madeleine-Résidence Les Chèvrefeuilles Appartement 65, 29, rue des Boulets F-75011 Paris / FR | 03 /
LAGRANGE, Alain 5, rue de Montry F-77770 Coupvray / FR | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Miszputen, Laurent, et al L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Miszputen, Laurent, et al L'Oréal - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | ||
Former [1999/39] | Miszputen, Laurent, et al L'Oreal, DPI, 6 rue Sincholle 92585 Clichy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97913267.7 | 06.11.1997 | [1999/39] | WO1997FR01995 | Priority number, date | FR19960015368 | 13.12.1996 Original published format: FR 9615368 | [1999/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9825922 | Date: | 18.06.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0944624 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0944624 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/14, C07D403/14, A61K31/53 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
C07D403/14 (EP);
A61K8/4966 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP);
C03C17/28 (EP);
C07D417/14 (EP);
C08K5/34926 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/39] | Title | German: | S-TRIAZINVERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS UV-FILTER | [1999/39] | English: | INSOLUBLE S-TRIAZINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS UV FILTERS | [1999/39] | French: | DERIVES INSOLUBLES DE S-TRIAZINE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME FILTRES UV | [1999/39] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 06.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.11.2003 | FI | 05.11.2003 | IE | 05.11.2003 | NL | 05.11.2003 | LU | 06.11.2003 | BE | 30.11.2003 | CH | 30.11.2003 | LI | 30.11.2003 | MC | 30.11.2003 | DK | 05.02.2004 | GR | 05.02.2004 | SE | 05.02.2004 | PT | 05.04.2004 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/30] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
IE | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
LU | 06.11.2003 | ||
BE | 30.11.2003 | ||
CH | 30.11.2003 | ||
LI | 30.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/16] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
IE | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
BE | 30.11.2003 | ||
CH | 30.11.2003 | ||
LI | 30.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
LU | 05.01.2004 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
IE | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
BE | 30.11.2003 | ||
CH | 30.11.2003 | ||
LI | 30.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
IE | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
BE | 30.11.2003 | ||
CH | 30.11.2003 | ||
LI | 30.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
IE | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
CH | 30.11.2003 | ||
LI | 30.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
IE | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
IE | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 05.11.2003 | |
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 05.02.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0165608 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-20* example 7 *; | [A]EP0570838 (SIGMA PROD CHIM [IT]) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [A]EP0704444 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-20 * example 3 * |