EP0904284 - 6-substituted amino-4-oxa-1-azabicyclo[3.2.0]heptan-7-one derivatives as cysteine protease inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/13] | 6-SUBSTITUTED AMINO-4-OXA-1-AZABICYCLO (3,2,0) HEPTAN-7-ONE DERIVATIVES AS CYSTEINE PROTEASE INHIBITORS | ||
[2001/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2002 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Naeja Pharmaceutical Inc. No. 2 Naeja Alberta Centre, 4290-91A Street Edmonton Alberta T6E 5V2 / CA | For all designated states NATIONAL RESEARCH COUNCIL OF CANADA Intellectual Property Services, EG-12, Bldg. M-58, Montreal Road Ottawa, Ontario K1A 0R6 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states Naeja Pharmaceutical Inc. No. 2 Naeja Alberta Centre, 4290-91A Street Edmonton, Alberta T6E 5V2 / CA | ||
For all designated states NATIONAL RESEARCH COUNCIL OF CANADA Intellectual Property Services, EG-12, Bldg. M-58, Montreal Road Ottawa, Ontario K1A 0R6 / CA | |||
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states Naeja Pharmaceutical Inc. No. 2 Taiho Alberta Center, 4290-91A Street Edmonton, Alberta T6E 5V2 / CA | ||
For all designated states NATIONAL RESEARCH COUNCIL OF CANADA Intellectual Property Services, EG-12, Bldg. M-58, Montreal Road Ottawa, Ontario K1A 0R6 / CA | |||
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states SYNPHAR LABORATORIES INC. 2 Taiho Alberta Center 4290-91A Street Edmonton Alberta T6E 5V2 / CA | ||
For all designated states NATIONAL RESEARCH COUNCIL OF CANADA Intellectual Property Services, EG-12, Bldg. M-58, Montreal Road Ottawa, Ontario K1A 0R6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGH, Rajeshwar 7927-22 Avenue Edmonton, Alberta T6K 1Z2 / CA | 02 /
ZHOU, Nian, E. 425 Michener Park Edmonton, Alberta T6H 4M5 / CA | 03 /
GUO, Deqi 1502 GH, Michener Park Edmonton, Alberta T6H 5B5 / CA | 04 /
KALETA, Jadwiga 3735-60 Street Edmonton, Alberta T6L 1V4 / CA | 05 /
CAMERON, Alan 2 Taiho Alberta Center, 4290-91A Street Edmonton, Alberta T6E 5V2 / CA | 06 /
PURISIMA, Enrico 4910 Geneviève, Pierrefonds Montreal, Quebec H9J 1S5 / CA | 07 /
MENARD, Robert 2702 Modugno Apartment 1 St. Laurent, Quebec H4R 1Z9 / CA | 08 /
MICETICH, Ronald, George 12 Braeside Terrace Sherwood Park, Alberta T8A 3V6 / CA | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Walsh, David Patrick, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Walsh, David Patrick, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 97914512.5 | 09.04.1997 | [1999/13] | WO1997IB00382 | Priority number, date | US19960015288P | 10.04.1996 Original published format: US 15288 P | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9738008 | Date: | 16.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0904284 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0904284 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/06, C07K5/08, C07D503/00, A61K38/55, A61K31/395 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D503/00 (EP,US);
C07K5/06026 (EP,US);
C07K5/06034 (EP,US);
C07K5/06043 (EP,US);
C07K5/06078 (EP,US);
C07K5/06165 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/13] | Title | German: | 6-Substituierte Amino-4-oxa-1-azabicyclo[3.2.0]heptan-7-on-Derivate als Cystein-Proteas-Inhibitoren | [2001/24] | English: | 6-substituted amino-4-oxa-1-azabicyclo[3.2.0]heptan-7-one derivatives as cysteine protease inhibitors | [2001/24] | French: | Dérivés d'amino-4-oxa-1-azabicyclo[3.2.0]heptan-7-one 6-substituée, inhibiteurs de la cysteine protease | [2001/24] |
Former [1999/13] | 6-SUBSTITUIERTE AMINO-4-OXA-1-AZABICYCLO (3,2,0) HEPTAN-7-ON-DERIVATE ALS CYSTEIN-PROTEAS-INHIBITOREN | ||
Former [1999/13] | 6-SUBSTITUTED AMINO-4-OXA-1-AZABICYCLO (3,2,0) HEPTAN-7-ONE DERIVATIVES AS CYSTEINE PROTEASE INHIBITORS | ||
Former [1999/13] | DERIVES D'AMINO-4-OXA-1-AZABICYCLO (3,2,0) HEPTAN-7-ONE 6-SUBSTITUEE, INHIBITEURS DE LA CYSTEINE PROTEASE | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 29.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.01.2002 | ES | 30.07.2002 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/04] | ES | 30.07.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9518807 (TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LIMITE [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * claim - *; | [A]DE3427651 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-18 * claim - *; | [A]US4202819 (KELLETT MARTHA [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column W *; | [A]WO8810266 (GRUBB ANDERS [SE], et al) [A] 1-18 * claim - *; | [DPA]WO9632408 (SYNPHAR LAB INC [CA]) [DPA] 1-18 * claim - * |