EP0914525 - METHOD AND AN ARRANGEMENT FOR EARTH SEPARATION AND LOADING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kalisiak, Witold ul. Natolinska 3 m.99 00-562 Warszawa / PL | [1999/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/19] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97914680.0 | 03.04.1997 | [1999/19] | WO1997PL00005 | Priority number, date | PL19960003172 | 02.12.1996 Original published format: PL 317296 | [1999/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9824983 | Date: | 11.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0914525 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/18, E02F3/24 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
E02F3/18 (EP);
E02F3/248 (EP);
E02F7/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABTRENNUNG UND LADUNG VON ERDE | [1999/19] | English: | METHOD AND AN ARRANGEMENT FOR EARTH SEPARATION AND LOADING | [1999/19] | French: | PROCEDE ET AGENCEMENT D'ENLEVEMENT ET DE CHARGEMENT DE TERRE | [1999/19] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 08.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/25] | 17.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2002 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.10.1998 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   26.11.1998 | 29.10.1998 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   26.11.1998 | 29.10.1998 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   26.11.1998 | 29.10.1998 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   26.11.1998 | 29.10.1998 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   26.11.1998 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.2021 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 01.02.2021 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 01.02.2021 | 10   M06   Not yet paid | 01.02.2021 | 11   M06   Not yet paid | 01.02.2021 | 12   M06   Not yet paid | 01.02.2021 | 13   M06   Not yet paid | 01.02.2021 | 14   M06   Not yet paid | 01.02.2021 | 15   M06   Not yet paid | 01.02.2021 | 16   M06   Not yet paid | 01.02.2021 | 17   M06   Not yet paid | 01.02.2021 | 18   M06   Not yet paid | 01.02.2021 | 19   M06   Not yet paid | 01.02.2021 | 20   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 02.01.2004 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: applicant has died | [2004/14] | 01.02.2021 | Resumption of proceedings | [2020/32] | 02.01.2004 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: applicant has died | [2020/32] | Cited in | International search | [YAX]US4180927 (SATTERWHITE) [Y] 1,2 * column 9, lines 28-53 * * column 11, lines 49-56 * * column 12, lines 30-42; figures 6-12,14,15,26 * [A] 4 [X] 5; | [Y]AU427389B (HITACHI) [Y] 1,2 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]CH464094 (BADE&CO) [A] 3 * column 2, lines 11-18; figure 2 *; | [A]US1386987 (BROWN) [A] 4 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE3503915 (PHB WESERHÜTTE) [A] 5 * figure 2 * |